Off-White LLC v. Abbyfashion Store et al
Case Number: 1:2021cv01785
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: On April 1, 2021, the Court granted Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. ECF No. 32. By November 30, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a letter on its intentions with respect to the continuation of this action. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/18/2021) (ate)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: The injunctive relief previously granted in the TRO shall remain in place through the pendency of this litigation, and issuing this Order is warranted under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65 and Section 34 of the Lanham Act . a) Accordingly, Defendants are hereby restrained and enjoined from engaging in any of the following acts or omissions pending the final hearing and determination of this action or until further order of the Court: as further set forth herein. Acco rdingly, the Third Party Service Providers and Financial Institutions are hereby restrained and enjoined from engaging in any of the following acts or omissions pending the final hearing and determination of this action or until further order of the Court. Within fourteen (14) days of receipt of service of this Order, the Third Party Service Providers shall provide to Plaintiff's counsel all documents and records in its possession, custody or control (whether located in the U.S. or abroad) relating to Defendants' User Accounts and Defendants' Merchant Storefronts, including, but not limited to, documents and records relating to: as further set forth herein. Defendants are hereby given notice that they may be deemed to have a ctual notice of the terms of this Order and any act by them or anyone of them in violation of this Order may be considered and prosecuted as in contempt of this Court. The $5,000.00 bond posted by Plaintiff shall remain with the Court until a fi nal disposition of this case or until this Order is terminated. This Order shall remain in effect during the pendency of this action, or until further order of the Court. Any Defendants that are subject to this Order may appear and move to dissolve or modify the Order on two (2) days' notice to Plaintiff or on shorter notice as set by the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/1/2021 at 2:00pm.) (kv) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing. Modified on 4/1/2021 (kv).
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: A hearing is scheduled in this matter for April 1, 2021, at 1:00 p.m. As stated in the Court's March 2, 2021 order, ECF No. 21 § II.A, the public may access audio of the hearing by dialing (888) 398-2342 or (215) 861-0674 and entering conference ID number 5598827. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/31/2021) (kv)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, On March 5, 2021, the Court ordered that Defendants appear on March 23, 2021, at 3:00 p.m., to show cause why a preliminary injunction should not issue. The Court finds good cause to ADJOURN the hearing scheduled for March 23, 2021, to Apr il 1, 2021, at 1:00 p.m. By March 26, 2021, Defendants shall file any opposing papers. By March 29, 2021, Plaintiff shall file any reply. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b)(2), the TRO is extended to April 1, 2021. Good cause exists fo r an extension, because adjourning the preliminary injunction hearing is necessary to ensure Defendants are afforded adequate notice, and continued restraint of Defendants and third parties in the interim period is necessary to protect Plaintiff' ;s rights against the irreparable harms demonstrated in its TRO application. By March 23, 2021, Plaintiff shall serve this order on Defendants using the same methods authorized by the TRO. By March 26, 2021, Plaintiff shall provide the Court with proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Show Cause Hearing set for 4/1/2021 at 01:00 PM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/22/2021) (kv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Off-White LLC v. Abbyfashion Store et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?