Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. JDS Construction Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: 111 West 57th Developer LLC, JDS Construction Group LLC, PMG West 57th Street LLC, 111 Construction Manager LLC, 111 West 57th Property Owner LLC and JDS Construction Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01931
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 oc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #28 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #26 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Marshall T. Potashner dated May 3, 2021., #26 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court isdirected to terminate ECF No. 28. ( Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company answer due 5/22/2021.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/3/2021) (rro)
May 3, 2021 Filing 28 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #26 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Marshall T. Potashner dated May 3, 2021. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company..(Potashner, Marshall)
April 16, 2021 Filing 27 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 111 Construction Manager LLC, 111 West 57th Developer LLC, 111 West 57th Property Owner LLC, JDS Construction Group LLC, JDS Construction Services LLC, PMG West 57th Street LLC..(Bourne, Andrew)
April 16, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,., COUNTERCLAIM against Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Document filed by 111 Construction Manager LLC, 111 West 57th Developer LLC, JDS Construction Services LLC, 111 West 57th Property Owner LLC, JDS Construction Group LLC, PMG West 57th Street LLC..(Bourne, Andrew)
April 2, 2021 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. JDS Construction Services LLC served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty AUTHORIZED AGENT in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company..(Potashner, Marshall)
April 2, 2021 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. 111 Construction Manager LLC served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty AUTHORIZED AGENT in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company..(Potashner, Marshall)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #22 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Andrew N. Bourne dated March 29, 2021., #1 Complaint. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 22. SO ORDERED. (All Defendants.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/30/21) (yv)
March 29, 2021 Filing 22 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Andrew N. Bourne dated March 29, 2021. Document filed by 111 Construction Manager LLC, 111 West 57th Developer LLC, 111 West 57th Property Owner LLC, JDS Construction Group LLC, JDS Construction Services LLC, PMG West 57th Street LLC..(Bourne, Andrew)
March 19, 2021 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. PMG West 57th Street LLC served on 3/12/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, AUTHORIZED AGENT in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company..(Potashner, Marshall)
March 19, 2021 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. 111 West 57th Property Owner LLC served on 3/12/2021, answer due 4/2/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, AUTHORIZED AGENT in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company..(Potashner, Marshall)
March 19, 2021 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. 111 West 57th Developer LLC served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, AUTHORIZED AGENT in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company..(Potashner, Marshall)
March 19, 2021 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. JDS Construction Group LLC served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, AUTHORIZED AGENT in the Office of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company..(Potashner, Marshall)
March 11, 2021 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company..(Potashner, Marshall)
March 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Marshall Todd Potashner to RE-FILE Document #9 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). YOU MUST SELECT THE SEARCH BUTTON. Select the correct name or create a new corporate parent. Add the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s) one party name at a time. (lb)
March 8, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/8/2021 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/8/2021) (kv)
March 8, 2021 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 111 Construction Manager LLC. (sj)
March 8, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 111 West 57th Developer LLC. (sj)
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JDS Construction Group LLC. (sj)
March 8, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JDS Construction Services LLC. (sj)
March 8, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to PMG West 57th Street LLC. (sj)
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 111 West 57th Property Owner LLC. (sj)
March 8, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
March 8, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
March 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marshall Todd Potashner. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
March 8, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 5, 2021 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company..(Potashner, Marshall) Modified on 3/11/2021 (lb).
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Potashner, Marshall)
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 1 1 1 Construction Manager LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company..(Potashner, Marshall)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 1 1 1 West 57th Developer LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company..(Potashner, Marshall)
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JDS CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company..(Potashner, Marshall)
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JDS Construction Services LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company..(Potashner, Marshall)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PMG West 57th Street LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company..(Potashner, Marshall)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 111 West 57th Property Owner LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company..(Potashner, Marshall)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 111 Construction Manager LLC, 111 West 57th Developer LLC, 111 West 57th Property Owner LLC, JDS Construction Group LLC, JDS Construction Services LLC, PMG West 57th Street LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24210508)Document filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pledge Agreement).(Potashner, Marshall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. JDS Construction Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 111 West 57th Developer LLC
Represented By: Andrew N. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JDS Construction Group LLC
Represented By: Andrew N. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMG West 57th Street LLC
Represented By: Andrew N. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 111 Construction Manager LLC
Represented By: Andrew N. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 111 West 57th Property Owner LLC
Represented By: Andrew N. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JDS Construction Services LLC
Represented By: Andrew N. Bourne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Marshall Todd Potashner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?