Manjarrez v. Bayard's Ale House et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Manjarrez
Defendant: 218 East 52nd St Restaurant LLC, Bayard's Ale House LLC and Niall Moran
Case Number: 1:2021cv01968
Filed: March 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, May 28, 2021 at 3:30 pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Initial Conference set for 5/28/2021 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/17/2021) (rjm)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 218 East 52nd St Restaurant LLC, Bayard's Ale House LLC, Niall Moran..(gp)
March 8, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
March 8, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
March 8, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
March 8, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Taubenfeld. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error FROM: Francisco Jose Manjarrez TO: Francisco Manjarrez, FROM: Bayard's Ale House TO: Bayard's Ale House LLC and FROM: 218 East 52nd Street Restaurant LLC TO: 218 East 52nd St Restaurant LLC. Party text was omitted: Francisco Manjarrez;. (gp)
March 6, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bayards Ale House LLC, 218 East 52nd Street Restaurant LLC, and Niall Moran, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Francisco Jose Manjarrez..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
March 6, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Taubenfeld, Michael)
March 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 218 East 52nd Street Restaurant LLC, Bayard's Ale House, Niall Moran. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24214972)Document filed by Francisco Jose Manjarrez..(Taubenfeld, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manjarrez v. Bayard's Ale House et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 218 East 52nd St Restaurant LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayard's Ale House LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niall Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Manjarrez
Represented By: Michael Taubenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?