Jaquez v. Groupe SEB USA
Plaintiff: Ramon Jaquez
Defendant: Groupe SEB USA
Case Number: 1:2021cv02032
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sidney H Stein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DISMISSAL ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: THAT pursuant to the parties' April 27, 2021 Stipulation of Dismissal [Doc. No. 11], all claims asserted against Defendant in Civil Action No. 1:21-cv-02032-SHS, are dismissed with prejudice; THAT the Clerk of Court is directed to amend the caption in this matter as follows, and as further specified in this Order. THAT all parties shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs incurred in this action. So ordered. Groupe SEB USA terminated. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/27/2021) (rjm)
April 27, 2021 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #12 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
April 27, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Ramon Jaquez. Related Document Number: #11 ..(Zelman, Yitzchak) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 27, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Groupe SEB USA and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Ramon Jaquez. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Zelman, Yitzchak)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Andrew G. Hope dated April 19, 2021 re: the parties have reached a settlement. Document filed by Groupe SEB USA. ENDORSEMENT: If the stipulation of dismissal is not filed by May 21, there will be an initial teleconference on May 21, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall dial 888-273-3658 and use access code 7004275 to join the conference. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 5/21/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/19/2021) (rjm)
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Andrew G. Hope dated April 19, 2021 re: the parties have reached a settlement. Document filed by Groupe SEB USA..(Hope, Andrew)
April 1, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Groupe SEB USA answer due 4/19/2021. (jca)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to respond to Complaint. Defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint is extended to April 19, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 4/1/2021) (jca)
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Andrew G. Hope dated March 31, 2021. Document filed by Groupe SEB USA..(Hope, Andrew)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew George Hope on behalf of Groupe SEB USA..(Hope, Andrew)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Groupe SEB USA served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Managing Agent. Document filed by Ramon Jaquez..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Groupe SEB USA. (sj)
March 10, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 10, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
March 10, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Sidney H. Stein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Groupe SEB USA, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ramon Jaquez..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zelman, Yitzchak)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Groupe SEB USA. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24226108)Document filed by Ramon Jaquez..(Zelman, Yitzchak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaquez v. Groupe SEB USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Jaquez
Represented By: Yitzchak Zelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groupe SEB USA
Represented By: Andrew George Hope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?