Hall et al v. Protoons Inc.
Plaintiff: Orville Hall and Phillip Price
Defendant: Protoons Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02043
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join One or More Indispensable Parties. . Document filed by Protoons Inc...(Parness, Hillel)
May 7, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join One or More Indispensable Parties. Document filed by Protoons Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Hillel I. Parness, #2 Exhibit EX 1 2021.04.19 ACE Repertory DRAGNET).(Parness, Hillel)
May 7, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hillel Ira Parness on behalf of Protoons Inc...(Parness, Hillel)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference; granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. GRANTED. The conference scheduled for May 11, 2021, is ADJOURNED to June 3, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. By May 27, 2021, the parties shall submit their joint letter and proposed case management plan. SO ORDERD. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/5/2021) ( Initial Conference set for 6/3/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (ks) Modified on 5/6/2021 (ks).
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Initial Pretrial Conference) addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Brian D. Caplan dated May 4, 2021., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Letter in advance of Initial Pretrial Conference and Proposed Case Management Plan addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Brian D. Caplan dated May 4, 2021. Document filed by Orville Hall, Phillip Price..(Caplan, Brian)
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Protoons Inc. served on 3/17/2021, answer due 4/7/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an agent of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Orville Hall; Phillip Price..(Wlodinguer, Julie)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/12/2021) (kv)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/12/2021) (kv)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, at 11:00 a.m. on May 11, 2021, to be held telephonically. The parties are directed to dial 888-398-2342 or 215-861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Initial Conference set for 5/11/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/12/2021) (kv)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Protoons Inc...(dnh)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Protoons Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Orville Hall, Phillip Price..(Wlodinguer, Julie)
March 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brian D. Caplan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Phillip Price; Orville Hall. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
March 10, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
March 10, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
March 10, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julie B. Wlodinguer on behalf of Orville Hall, Phillip Price..(Wlodinguer, Julie)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Caplan, Brian)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Protoons Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24227632)Document filed by Orville Hall, Phillip Price. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 1985 Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - November 18, 2020 Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - December 22, 2020 Email, #4 Exhibit 4 - December 30, 2020 Email).(Caplan, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. Protoons Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orville Hall
Represented By: Brian D. Caplan
Represented By: Julie B. Wlodinguer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Price
Represented By: Brian D. Caplan
Represented By: Julie B. Wlodinguer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protoons Inc.
Represented By: Hillel Ira Parness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?