Friederick v. Passfeed, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Friederick
Defendant: Passfeed, Inc., Richard Wang and Atilla Sary
Case Number: 1:2021cv02066
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Gregory W. Kirschenbaum, Esq. dated May 7, 2021 re: Defendant Passfeed Inc. and Defendant Richard Wang's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Jamie Friederick..(Kirschenbaum, Gregory)
April 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Passfeed, Inc., Richard Wang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corporate Filing, #2 Exhibit B - Information and address information, #3 Exhibit C - Passfeed Employment Policies, #4 Exhibit D - Civil Complaint, #5 Declaration of Robin J. Gray).(Gray, Robin)
April 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Passfeed, Inc., Richard Wang. Responses due by 5/25/2021.(Gray, Robin)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Robin J.Gray dated 03/31/2021. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/1/2021) (va)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Gregory W. Kirschenbaum, Esq. dated March 31, 2021 re: Consent to Defendant Passfeed Inc. and Defendant Richard Wang's request for a 30-day extension of their time to Answer. Document filed by Jamie Friederick..(Kirschenbaum, Gregory)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Robin J.Gray dated 03/31/2021. Document filed by Passfeed, Inc., Richard Wang..(Gray, Robin)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robin Jean Gray on behalf of Passfeed, Inc., Richard Wang..(Gray, Robin)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Passfeed, Inc., Atilla Sary, Richard Wang. (sj)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Passfeed, Inc., Atilla Sary, individually, and Richard Wang, individually, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jamie Friederick..(Kirschenbaum, Gregory)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gregory William Kirschenbaum. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gregory William Kirschenbaum to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the PDF 'To' section contains a typographical error (Atilla Saray). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Passfeed, Inc., Atilla Sary, individually, and Richard Wang, individually, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jamie Friederick..(Kirschenbaum, Gregory) Modified on 3/11/2021 (jgo).
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kirschenbaum, Gregory)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Passfeed, Inc., Atilla Sary, Richard Wang. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24230701)Document filed by Jamie Friederick..(Kirschenbaum, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friederick v. Passfeed, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Passfeed, Inc.
Represented By: Robin Jean Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Wang
Represented By: Robin Jean Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atilla Sary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Friederick
Represented By: Gregory William Kirschenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?