Housey v. Procter & Gamble Company
Plaintiff: Belinda Housey
Defendant: Procter & Gamble Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv02286
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 ct
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gawon Go on behalf of Procter & Gamble Company..(Go, Gawon)
April 20, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marianne Kies on behalf of Procter & Gamble Company..(Kies, Marianne)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 Motion for Andrew Soukup to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/12/2021) (mml)
April 9, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Andrew Soukup to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24377062. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Procter & Gamble Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - IL Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration in Support of Motion).(Soukup, Andrew)
April 9, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Andrew Soukup to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24377062. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #6 Motion for Henry B. Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/8/2021) (mml)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/8/2021) (mml)
April 8, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Henry B. Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24366061. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 8, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Procter & Gamble Company answer due 5/24/2021. (mml)
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Henry B. Liu dated April 7, 2021. Document filed by Procter & Gamble Company..(Liu, Henry)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Procter & Gamble Company..(Liu, Henry)
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Henry B. Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24366061. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Procter & Gamble Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration in Support of Motion).(Liu, Henry)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Procter & Gamble Company served on 3/23/2021, answer due 4/13/2021. Service was accepted by Shelbi Sullenberger, Registered Agent. Document filed by Belinda Housey..(Shub, Jonathan)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Procter & Gamble Company..(dnh)
March 17, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
March 17, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
March 17, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
March 16, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Procter & Gamble Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Belinda Housey..(Shub, Jonathan)
March 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Shub, Jonathan)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Procter & Gamble Company. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24261179)Document filed by Belinda Housey..(Shub, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Housey v. Procter & Gamble Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Procter & Gamble Company
Represented By: Andrew Soukup
Represented By: Gawon Go
Represented By: Henry Liu
Represented By: Marianne Kies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Housey
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?