Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Plaintiff: Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 1:2021cv02443
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/12/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/12/2021 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rebecca Forman, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/1/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Friedman, Rebecca)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 4/12/2021. (Kotowski, Linda)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Ruth Friedman on behalf of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Friedman, Rebecca)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 4/5/2021. Courts decision: the parties need not submit a proposed Case Management Plan, but the telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference will proceed as scheduled on April 12, 2021 at 11:15 am using the dial-in information previously posted. (Kotowski, Linda)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Affidavit of Service).(Azmi, Nimra)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 4-12-2021, ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:15 am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 4/12/2021 at 11:15 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/1/2021) (va)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 Motion for Thomas R. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/1/2021) (va)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Thomas R. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24326553. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO PHV application, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Burke, Thomas)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Thomas R. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24326553. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(dnh)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law..(Azmi, Nimra)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nimra H. Azmi to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Court name is not on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law..(Azmi, Nimra) Modified on 3/22/2021 (jgo).
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law..(Azmi, Nimra)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Azmi, Nimra)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24280827)Document filed by Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Azmi, Nimra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brennan Center For Justice At New York University School Of Law
Represented By: Nimra H. Azmi
Represented By: Thomas Rohlfs Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?