Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. Nav Tech Construction Corp.
Petitioner: The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York and New York City District Council of Carpenters
Respondent: Nav Tech Construction Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02502
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment, the Declaration of William Davidian in Support of the Motion for Summary Judgment, the Declaration of Marlie Blaise, Esq. in Support of the Motion for Summary Judgment, and Plaintiffs Rule 56.1 Statement served on Nav Tech Construction Corp. on April 20, 2021. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Blaise, Marlie)
April 15, 2021 Filing 15 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Blaise, Marlie)
April 15, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Marlie Blaise, Esq. in Support re: #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund. (Attachments: #1 History Bill, #2 Proposed Judgment).(Blaise, Marlie)
April 15, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION of William Davidian in Support re: #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund. (Attachments: #1 2011-2015 Agreement, #2 Interim Compliance, #3 Notice to Terminate, #4 Collection Policy, #5 Notice of Hearing, #6 Arbitration Award).(Blaise, Marlie)
April 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Blaise, Marlie)
April 8, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,, served. Nav Tech Construction Corp. served on 4/6/2021, answer due 4/27/2021. Service was accepted by Mr. Smith, General Agent. Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund ; New York City District Council of Carpenters; Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund..(Blaise, Marlie)
March 30, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,, served. Nav Tech Construction Corp. served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, an authorized person in the Corporation Division of the Department of State. Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund ; New York City District Council of Carpenters; Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund..(Blaise, Marlie)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: #2 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,, filed by New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York. Accordingly, 1. By April 22, 2021, Petitioners shall file and serve a statement pursuant to Local Civil Rule 56.1 and any additional materials with which they intend to support the petition, including memoranda of law, the arbitration award, supporting documents, and any affidavits or declarations attesting that the exhibits are true and correct copies of what they purport to be; 2. By May 6, 2021, Respondent shall file its opposition papers; and 3. Petitioners' reply, if any, is due by May 13, 2021. By April 8, 2021, Petitioners shall serve a copy of the petition and this order upon Respondent by personal service on an officer, director, managing or general agent, or cashier or assistant cashier or to any other agent authorized by appointment or by law to receive service, pursuant to N.Y. C.P.L.R. 311, and upon the secretary of state, pursuant to N.Y. Bus. Corp. Law 306. By April 15, 2021, Petitioners shall file an affidavit of such service. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 5/6/2021, Replies due by 5/13/2021.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/25/2021) (kv)
March 24, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nav Tech Construction Corp...(dnh)
March 24, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
March 24, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
March 24, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nicole Marimon. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; The New York City District Council of Carpenters. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: Exclude from the entry of business name any leading A, An or The.. (dnh)
March 24, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marlie P. Blaise on behalf of The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Blaise, Marlie)
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #2 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,, . Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
March 23, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
March 23, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nav Tech Construction Corp., re: #2 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,. Document filed by The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Marimon, Nicole)
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24293611).Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund. (Attachments: #1 2011-2015 Agreement, #2 Interim Compliance, #3 Notice to Terminate, #4 Collection Policy, #5 Notice of Hearing, #6 Arbitration Award, #7 History Bill, #8 Proposed Judgment).(Marimon, Nicole)
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Marimon on behalf of The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Marimon, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. Nav Tech Construction Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The New York City District Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Marlie P. Blaise
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund
Represented By: Marlie P. Blaise
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
Represented By: Marlie P. Blaise
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York
Represented By: Marlie P. Blaise
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York
Represented By: Marlie P. Blaise
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: New York City District Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Marlie P. Blaise
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nav Tech Construction Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?