Bookends & Beginnings LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bookends & Beginnings LLC
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc., HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C., Hachette Book Group, Inc., Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC, Simon & Schuster, Inc. and Penguin Random House LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02584
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Debra C Freeman
Referring Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #40 MOTION for Kaylynn Noethlich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24557446. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #39 MOTION for Ilana Kattan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24557439. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #38 MOTION for Richard Snyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24557430. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
May 18, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION for Kaylynn Noethlich to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24557446. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hachette Book Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Noethlich, Kaylynn)
May 18, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION for Ilana Kattan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24557439. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hachette Book Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Kattan, Ilana)
May 18, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION for Richard Snyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24557430. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Hachette Book Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Snyder, Richard)
May 18, 2021 Filing 37 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hachette Livre USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Lagardere North America Inc., Corporate Parent Lagardre Media, Corporate Parent Lagardre SCA for Hachette Book Group, Inc.. Document filed by Hachette Book Group, Inc...(Hembree, Nathan)
May 18, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nathan Hembree on behalf of Hachette Book Group, Inc...(Hembree, Nathan)
May 18, 2021 Filing 35 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bertelsmann SE & Co. KGaA for Penguin Random House LLC. Document filed by Penguin Random House LLC..(Morgenstern, Saul)
May 18, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Margaret Anne Rogers on behalf of Penguin Random House LLC..(Rogers, Margaret)
May 18, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Saul P Morgenstern on behalf of Penguin Random House LLC..(Morgenstern, Saul)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Clerk of Court of the Southern District of New York is directed to docket the within ORDER in each of the following actions: Fremgen et al v. Amazon.com, Inc. 1:21-cv-00351-GHW-DCF Sacks v. Amazon.Com, Inc. 1:21-cv-00421-GHW-DCF Weinberger v. Amazon.com, Inc. 1:21-cv-00615-GHW-DCF Bonilla v. Amazon.Com, Inc 1:21-cv-01130-GHW-DCF Silverman et al v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al 1:21-cv-01256-GHW-DCF Cook et al v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al 1:21-cv-01369-GHW-DCF Lerner v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al 1:21-cv-01561-GHW-DCF Bookends & Beginnings LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al 1:21-cv-02584-GHW-DCF. The above-referenced related cases having been referred to this Court for general pretrial supervision, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. This Court will hold an initial pretrial conference in these cases, collectively, on July 13, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The conference will be held telephonically, and the parties are directed to call the following Toll-Free Number: 877-411-9748 and use Access Code: 9612281. 2. In each of the above-referenced cases, the parties are directed to file, no later than July 6, 2021, a jointly proposed discovery plan, pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Prior to making such filings, however, the parties in the various cases are directed to confer, so as to determine whether a single, coordinated discovery schedule for all of the cases would be appropriate. The parties submissions should address all of the matters set out in Rule 26(f)(3), and should specifically include proposed deadlines for: a. service of initial disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1); b. service of initial document requests and interrogatories; c. any motion for joinder of other parties or amendment of the pleadings; d. completion of fact discovery; and e. expert disclosures and the completion of expert discovery, if any. Initial Conference set for 7/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 5/4/2021) (nb)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Jeffrey Hoke Bergman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Alberto Rodriguez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Eamon Padraic Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Paul Ethan Slater to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Joseph Michael Vanek to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Barbara A. Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/2/2021) (mro) Modified on 4/5/2021 (mro).
April 2, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Jeffrey Hoke Bergman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24346382. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bookends & Beginnings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Bergman, Jeffrey)
April 2, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Alberto Rodriguez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24346219. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bookends & Beginnings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Rodriguez, Alberto)
April 2, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Eamon Padraic Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24346047. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bookends & Beginnings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Kelly, Eamon)
April 2, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Paul Ethan Slater to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24345976. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bookends & Beginnings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Slater, Paul)
April 2, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Joseph Michael Vanek to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24345851. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bookends & Beginnings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Vanek, Joseph)
April 2, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Barbara A. Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24344840. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bookends & Beginnings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Barbara A. Mahoney, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Mahoney, Barbara)
April 2, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24344708. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bookends & Beginnings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steve W. Berman, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Berman, Steve)
April 2, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Eamon Padraic Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24346047. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
April 2, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-00351-GHW-DCF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
April 2, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for Alberto Rodriguez to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24346219. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
April 2, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
April 2, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #23 MOTION for Jeffrey Hoke Bergman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24346382. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
April 2, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for Paul Ethan Slater to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24345976. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
April 2, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for Barbara A. Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24344840. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #17 MOTION for Steve W. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24344708. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
April 2, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Joseph Michael Vanek to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24345851. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
April 2, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
April 1, 2021 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent News Corporation for HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C.. Document filed by HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C...(Lent, Charles)
April 1, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Scott Lent on behalf of HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C...(Lent, Charles)
March 31, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Amazon.com, Inc. waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. Document filed by Bookends & Beginnings LLC..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
March 30, 2021 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ViacomCBS Inc., Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for Simon & Schuster, Inc.. Document filed by Simon & Schuster, Inc...(Buchweitz, Yehudah)
March 30, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Michael Swenson on behalf of Simon & Schuster, Inc...(Swenson, Robert)
March 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Leonard White on behalf of Simon & Schuster, Inc...(White, Jeffrey)
March 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yehudah Lev Buchweitz on behalf of Simon & Schuster, Inc...(Buchweitz, Yehudah)
March 29, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Simon & Schuster, Inc. waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. Document filed by Bookends & Beginnings LLC..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
March 29, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Penguin Random House LLC waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. Document filed by Bookends & Beginnings LLC..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
March 29, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. Document filed by Bookends & Beginnings LLC..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
March 29, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C. waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. Document filed by Bookends & Beginnings LLC..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Hachette Book Group, Inc. waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. Document filed by Bookends & Beginnings LLC..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
March 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nathaniel A. Tarnor. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Bookends & Beginnings LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
March 26, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 26, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
March 26, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Gregory H. Woods as possibly related to 21-cv-351. (jgo)
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-351. Document filed by Bookends & Beginnings LLC..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bookends & Beginnings LLC..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.com, Inc., Hachette Book Group, Inc., HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C., Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC, Penguin Random House LLC, Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24307828)Document filed by Bookends & Beginnings LLC..(Tarnor, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bookends & Beginnings LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C.
Represented By: Charles Scott Lent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hachette Book Group, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Hembree
Represented By: Richard Sutton Snyder, Sr.
Represented By: Kaylynn Noethlich
Represented By: Ilana Kattan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Represented By: Yehudah Lev Buchweitz
Represented By: Robert Michael Swenson
Represented By: Jeffrey Leonard White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penguin Random House LLC
Represented By: Margaret Anne Rogers
Represented By: Saul P Morgenstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bookends & Beginnings LLC
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Represented By: Alberto Rodriguez
Represented By: Jeffrey Hoke Bergman
Represented By: Paul Ethan Slater
Represented By: Barbara Mahoney
Represented By: Eamon P. Kelly
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Joseph M Vanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?