Sanchez v. Cratejoy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cristian Sanchez
Defendant: Cratejoy, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02589
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 6/11/2021 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/19/2021) (nb)
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cratejoy, Inc...(jgo)
March 26, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 26, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
March 26, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cratejoy, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cratejoy, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24308117)Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Cratejoy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cratejoy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristian Sanchez
Represented By: Joseph H Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?