Global Gaming Philippines, LLC v. Razon, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: GLOBAL GAMING PHILIPPINES, LLC
Defendant: COLLINGWOOD APPALACHIAN MINERALS, LLC, COLLINGWOOD OIL & GAS HOLDINGS, LLC, ENSARA LLC, FESARA LLC, RIZOLINA LLC, CAMPANILLA LLC, COLLINGWOOD USA, INC., ASIA ARROW LIMITED, 11 ESSEX STREET REALTY LLC, NOZAR LLC, ENRIQUE K. RAZON, JR, COLLINGWOOD BROOKSHIRE USA, INC., BLOOMBERRY RESORTS AND HOTELS INC., SURESTE PROPERTIES, INC., BOWERY BAY LLC and Enrique K. Razon, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02655
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Ainsworth, Kevin)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Daniel M. Perry; Brett Lowe, New Attorney: Rachel Penski Fissell; Daniel R. Walfish . Document filed by 11 Essex Street Realty LLC, Asia Arrow Limited, Bowery Bay LLC, Campanilla LLC, Ensara LLC, Fesara LLC, Nozar LLC, Enrique K. Razon, Jr., Rizolina LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Rachel Penski Fissell in Support of Stipulation and Proposed Order of Substitution of Counsel).(Fissell, Rachel)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Collingwood Investment Company Limited for Asia Arrow Limited. Document filed by 11 Essex Street Realty LLC, Asia Arrow Limited, Bowery Bay LLC, Campanilla LLC, Ensara LLC, Fesara LLC, Nozar LLC, Rizolina LLC..(Fissell, Rachel)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER with respect to #68 Letter Motion for Conference re: #68 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: requesting a prehearing conference and/or reconsideration of the Court's denial of stay of discovery addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Corey J. Seel dated May 24, 2021. By May 28, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a responsive letter. So Ordered.. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/25/2021) (nb)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel and pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4, that the law firm of MehaffyWeber, P.C. is hereby substituted in place of the law firm Milbank LLP as counsel of record for Defendants Collingwood Oil & Gas Holdings, LLC; Collingwood USA, Inc., Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., and Collingwood Appalachian Minerals, LLC (Collingwood Defendants) in the above-captioned case. A declaration in support of this stipulation and order for substitution of counsel is attached hereto as pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4. As the Collingwood Defendants have not yet filed an Answer, this Stipulation is filed without waiver of any claims, defenses or motions that the Collingwood Defendants may file. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that all pleadings, notices of hearing, and other filings in this matter should be served upon the undersigned incoming counsel. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/25/2021) (nb)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/28/2021 (nb)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: requesting a prehearing conference and/or reconsideration of the Court's denial of stay of discovery addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Corey J. Seel dated May 24, 2021. Document filed by Collingwood Appalachian Minerals, LLC, Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Collingwood Oil & Gas Holdings, LLC, Collingwood USA, Inc...(Seel, Corey)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Daniel Perry and Brett Love, New Attorney: Corey J. Seel and Diana J. Shelby Stipulation and Proposed Order of Substitution of Counsel. Document filed by Collingwood Appalachian Minerals, LLC, Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Collingwood Oil & Gas Holdings, LLC, Collingwood USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Corey J. Seel in Support of Stipulation and Proposed Order of Substitution of Counsel).(Seel, Corey)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Diana J. Shelby on behalf of Collingwood Appalachian Minerals, LLC, Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Collingwood Oil & Gas Holdings, LLC, Collingwood USA, Inc...(Shelby, Diana)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Corey J. Seel on behalf of Collingwood Appalachian Minerals, LLC, Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Collingwood Oil & Gas Holdings, LLC, Collingwood USA, Inc...(Seel, Corey)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Robert Walfish on behalf of 11 Essex Street Realty LLC, Asia Arrow Limited, Bowery Bay LLC, Campanilla LLC, Ensara LLC, Fesara LLC, Nozar LLC, Enrique K. Razon, Jr., Rizolina LLC..(Walfish, Daniel)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Penski Fissell on behalf of 11 Essex Street Realty LLC, Asia Arrow Limited, Bowery Bay LLC, Campanilla LLC, Ensara LLC, Fesara LLC, Nozar LLC, Enrique K. Razon, Jr., Rizolina LLC..(Fissell, Rachel)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/13/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/13/2021 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sadie Herbert, (212) 805-0310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/11/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/21/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Konor Andrew Cormier to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24572183. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Collingwood Appalachian Minerals, LLC, Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Collingwood Oil & Gas Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion, #2 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Motion).(Cormier, Konor)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Diana J. Shelby to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #55 Letter,, filed by 11 Essex Street Realty LLC, Fesara LLC, Bloomberry Resorts and Hotels Inc., Collingwood USA, Inc., Sureste Properties, Inc., Bowery Bay LLC, Nozar LLC, COLLINGWOOD OIL & GAS HOLDINGS, LLC, Ensara LLC, Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Enrique K. Razon, Jr., Collingwood Appalachian Minerals, LLC, Collingwood Oil & Gas Holdings, LLC, Campanilla LLC, Asia Arrow Limited, Rizolina LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The application is GRANTED. The deadline for the Collingwood Entitites, Real Estate Entities and Razon to serve initial disclosures is extended to May 27, 2021. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/21/2021) (cf)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Corey J. Seel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Kevin N. Ainsworth dated May 21, 2021 re: Delay of Initial Disclosures and Change of Counsel. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Ainsworth, Kevin)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #60 MOTION for Konor Andrew Cormier to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24572183. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Dan Perry dated 05/20/2021 re: Request for Extension of Initial Disclosure Deadline. Document filed by 11 Essex Street Realty LLC, Asia Arrow Limited, Bloomberry Resorts and Hotels Inc., Bowery Bay LLC, Campanilla LLC, Collingwood Appalachian Minerals, LLC, Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Collingwood Oil & Gas Holdings, LLC, Collingwood USA, Inc., Ensara LLC, Fesara LLC, Nozar LLC, Enrique K. Razon, Jr., Rizolina LLC, Sureste Properties, Inc...(Perry, Daniel)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION for Diana J. Shelby to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24568278. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Collingwood Appalachian Minerals, LLC, Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Collingwood Oil & Gas Holdings, LLC, Collingwood USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Pro Hac).(Shelby, Diana)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for Corey J. Seel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24568032. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Collingwood Appalachian Minerals, LLC, Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Collingwood Oil & Gas Holdings, LLC, Collingwood USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affidavit in support, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Seel, Corey)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #54 MOTION for Diana J. Shelby to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24568278. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #53 MOTION for Corey J. Seel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24568032. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Iris Greenquist on behalf of Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Greenquist, Iris)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No additional parties may be joined after two months prior to the close of fact discovery without leave of Court. Amended pleadings may be filed without leave of Court until for the first amended pleading, June 15, 2021 or 21 days after service of a motion under 12)b, whichever is later. Further amended pleadings require leave of Court. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than 10/11/2021. The parties shall meet and confer to set interim fact discovery deadlines that allow for the completion of all fact discovery by October 11, 2021. These deadlines may be set by the written consent of the parties and without application to the Court. This case is plaintiff is for jury and defendants are not to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 2-3 weeks. On 1/13/2022 at 10:40 A.M. a pre-motion conference will be held for any anticipated dispositive motions, as further set forth in this Order. A party wishing to file a summary judgment or other dispositive motionshall file a pre-motion letter at least two weeks before the conference andin the form provided in the Courts Individual Rule III.A.1. Any partywishing to oppose shall file a responsive letter as provided in the sameIndividual Rule. The motion will be discussed at the conference. To jointhe conference, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and use Access Code558-3333. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shallbe ready to proceed at that time. Amended Pleadings due by 6/15/2021. Fact Discovery due by 10/11/2021. Expert Discovery due by 12/27/2021. Telephone Conference set for 1/13/2022 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/13/2021) (cf)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys for the Parties, as follows: 1. Plaintiff may file and serve a First Amended Complaint, as of right, on or before June 15, 2021. 2. Defendants are not required to file or serve an answer in response to the Complaint. Defendants' time to file and serve an answer in response to the First Amended Complaint shall be 30 days after Plaintiff files it by ECF. So ordered. (Amended Pleadings due by 6/15/2021. Service due by 6/15/2021.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/13/2021) (rjm)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: ORDERED that the parties shall brief any motion to dismiss the amended complaint (due June 15, 2021), according to the following schedule: by July 15, 2021, Defendants shall file their opening brief, not to exceed thirty (30) pages; by August 13, 2021, Plaintiff shall file its opposition brief, not to exceed thirty (30) pages; and by September 3, 2021, Defendants shall file their reply brief, not to exceed thirteen (13) pages. (As further set forth in this Order.) It is further ORDERED that Defendants' request to stay proceedings pending resolution of the motion to dismiss is DENIED. ( Motions due by 7/15/2021., Responses due by 8/13/2021, Replies due by 9/3/2021.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/13/2021) (cf)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/13/2021. (Court Reporter Present) (jcs)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: WHEREAS, an initial pre-trial and pre-motion conference is scheduled for May 13, 2021, at 10:40 a.m. Dkt. Nos. 38 and 40. It is hereby ORDERED that the initial pre-trial and pre-motion conference is RESCHEDULED for May 13, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. The conference will be telephonic and will occur on the conference line the parties provided: 415-655-0003, access code: 185 698 0353. ( Initial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield., Telephone Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/12/2021) (cf)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Kevin N. Ainsworth dated May 10, 2021 re: #43 Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Ainsworth, Kevin)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Kevin N. Ainsworth dated May 6, 2021 re: Pre-Conference Letter. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Proposed Case Mangement Plan).(Ainsworth, Kevin)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Ainsworth, Kevin)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin N. Ainsworth on behalf of Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Ainsworth, Kevin)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Daniel M. Perry dated May 3, 2021 re: Pre-Motion Letter re Discovery. Document filed by 11 Essex Street Realty LLC, Asia Arrow Limited, Bloomberry Resorts and Hotels Inc., Bowery Bay LLC, Campanilla LLC, Collingwood Appalachian Minerals, LLC, Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Collingwood Oil & Gas Holdings, LLC, Collingwood USA, Inc., Ensara LLC, Fesara LLC, Nozar LLC, Enrique K. Razon, Jr., Rizolina LLC, Sureste Properties, Inc...(Perry, Daniel)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Jason P.W. Halperin dated April 29, 2021 re: #39 Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Halperin, Jason)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Brett P. Lowe to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Motion for Daniel T. Pascucci to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and granting #8 Motion for Joseph R. Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #39 Letter, filed by 11 Essex Street Realty LLC, Fesara LLC, Bloomberry Resorts and Hotels Inc., Collingwood USA, Inc., Sureste Properties, Inc., Bowery Bay LLC, Nozar LLC, COLLINGWOOD OIL & GAS HOLDINGS, LLC, Ensara LLC, Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Enrique K. Razon, Jr., Collingwood Appalachian Minerals, LLC, Collingwood Oil & Gas Holdings, LLC, Campanilla LLC, Asia Arrow Limited, Rizolina LLC. ENDORSEMENT: By April 29, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a responsive letter. Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss will be discussed during the initial pretrial conference scheduled for May 13, 2021 (Dkt. No. 38). (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/22/2021) (cf)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Daniel M. Perry dated April 21, 2021 re: Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by 11 Essex Street Realty LLC, Asia Arrow Limited, Bloomberry Resorts and Hotels Inc., Bowery Bay LLC, Campanilla LLC, Collingwood Appalachian Minerals, LLC, Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Collingwood Oil & Gas Holdings, LLC, Collingwood USA, Inc., Ensara LLC, Fesara LLC, Nozar LLC, Enrique K. Razon, Jr., Rizolina LLC, Sureste Properties, Inc...(Perry, Daniel)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The conference will be telephonic. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/16/2021) (cf)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/2/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/2/2021 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Moore, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/17/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bloomberry Resorts Corp., Corporate Parent Sureste Properties, Inc. for Bloomberry Resorts and Hotels Inc.; Corporate Parent COLLINGWOOD OIL & GAS HOLDINGS, LLC, Corporate Parent Collingwood Investment Company Limited for Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Collingwood USA, Inc.; Corporate Parent Bloomberry Resorts Corp. for Sureste Properties, Inc.. Document filed by Bloomberry Resorts and Hotels Inc., Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Collingwood USA, Inc., Sureste Properties, Inc...(Perry, Daniel)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Daniel Mumford Perry to RE-FILE Document #33 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #34 MOTION for Brett P. Lowe to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Brett P. Lowe to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by 11 Essex Street Realty LLC, Asia Arrow Limited, Bloomberry Resorts and Hotels Inc., Bowery Bay LLC, Campanilla LLC, Collingwood Appalachian Minerals, LLC, Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Collingwood Oil & Gas Holdings, LLC, Collingwood USA, Inc., Ensara LLC, Fesara LLC, Nozar LLC, Enrique K. Razon, Jr., Rizolina LLC, Sureste Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit in Support, #3 Proposed Order).(Lowe, Brett)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bloomberry Resorts Corp. for Bloomberry Resorts and Hotels Inc., Sureste Properties, Inc.. Document filed by Bloomberry Resorts and Hotels Inc., Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Collingwood USA, Inc., Sureste Properties, Inc...(Perry, Daniel) Modified on 4/13/2021 (ldi).
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying #10 Motion for TRO. WHEREAS, on April 2, 2021, a show cause hearing was held. For the reasons stated during the hearing, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Docket No. 10. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/7/2021) (cf)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Plaintiffs Motion for Order Restraining Defendants from Removal, Transfer or other Dissipation of Mobile Asset Pending Turnover, Plaintiffs Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion for Order Restraining Defendants from Removal, Transfer or other Dissipation of Mobile Asset Pending Turnover, Proposed Order to Show Cause, Declaration of Jason P.W. Halperin, Exhibits A-O to the Declaration of Jason P.W. Halperin, Declaration of Daniel H. Weiner, Exhibits A-C to the Declaration of Daniel H. Weiner, and Order signed by the Hon. Lorna G. Schofield served on Enrique K. Razon, Jr. on 3/31/2021. Service was accepted by Phil Difley, concierge for The Plaza. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Halperin, Jason)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #10 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on Defendants From Removal, Transfer or Other Dissipation of Mobile Asset Pending Turnover. . Document filed by 11 Essex Street Realty LLC, Asia Arrow Limited, Bloomberry Resorts and Hotels Inc., Bowery Bay LLC, Campanilla LLC, Collingwood Appalachian Minerals, LLC, Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Collingwood Oil & Gas Holdings, LLC, Collingwood USA, Inc., Ensara LLC, Fesara LLC, Nozar LLC, Enrique K. Razon, Jr., Rizolina LLC, Sureste Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Perry, Daniel)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael D. Nolan on behalf of 11 Essex Street Realty LLC, Asia Arrow Limited, Bloomberry Resorts and Hotels Inc., Bowery Bay LLC, Campanilla LLC, Collingwood Appalachian Minerals, LLC, Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Collingwood Oil & Gas Holdings, LLC, Collingwood USA, Inc., Ensara LLC, Fesara LLC, Nozar LLC, Enrique K. Razon, Jr., Rizolina LLC, Sureste Properties, Inc...(Nolan, Michael)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Mumford Perry on behalf of 11 Essex Street Realty LLC, Asia Arrow Limited, Bloomberry Resorts and Hotels Inc., Bowery Bay LLC, Campanilla LLC, Collingwood Appalachian Minerals, LLC, Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Collingwood Oil & Gas Holdings, LLC, Collingwood USA, Inc., Ensara LLC, Fesara LLC, Nozar LLC, Enrique K. Razon, Jr., Rizolina LLC, Sureste Properties, Inc...(Perry, Daniel)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order [Dkt. No. 15] and Order [Dkt. No. 16] served on Bank of Bangladesh Counsel on 4/1/2021. Service was made by Electronic Mail. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Halperin, Jason)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order [Dkt. No. 15] and Order [Dkt. No. 16] served on Philippine Arbitration Counsel on 4/1/2021. Service was made by Electronic Mail. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Halperin, Jason)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order [Dkt. No. 15] and Order [Dkt. No. 16] served on Milbank Arbitration Counsel on 4/1/2021. Service was made by Electronic Mail. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Halperin, Jason)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order [Dkt. No. 15] and Order [Dkt. No. 16] served on Estella Tuason-Occena on 4/1/2021. Service was made by Electronic Mail. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Halperin, Jason)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order [Dkt. No. 15] and Order [Dkt. No. 16] served on Enrique K. Razon, Jr. on 4/1/2021. Service was made by Electronic Mail. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Halperin, Jason)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Motion for Order Restraining Defendants From Removal, Transfer or Other Dissipation of Mobile Asset Pending Turnover, Memorandum in Support, Declaration of Daniel H. Weiner, Declaration of Jason P.W. Halperin, Proposed Order and Signed Order served on Bank of Bangladesh Counsel on 3/31/2021. Service was made by Electronic Mail. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Halperin, Jason)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Motion for Order Restraining Defendants From Removal, Transfer or Other Dissipation of Mobile Asset Pending Turnover, Memorandum in Support, Declaration of Daniel H. Weiner, Declaration of Jason P.W. Halperin, Proposed Order and Signed Order served on Philippine Arbitration Counsel on 3/31/2021. Service was made by Electronic Mail. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Halperin, Jason)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Motion for Order Restraining Defendants From Removal, Transfer or Other Dissipation of Mobile Asset Pending Turnover, Memorandum in Support, Declaration of Daniel H. Weiner, Declaration of Jason P.W. Halperin, Proposed Order and Signed Order served on Milbank Arbitration Counsel on 3/31/2021. Service was made by Electronic Mail. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Halperin, Jason)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Motion for Order Restraining Defendants From Removal, Transfer or Other Dissipation of Mobile Asset Pending Turnover, Memorandum in Support, Declaration of Daniel H. Weiner, Declaration of Jason P.W. Halperin, Proposed Order and Signed Order served on Estella Tuason-Occena on 3/31/2021. Service was made by Electronic Mail. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Halperin, Jason)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Motion for Order Restraining Defendants From Removal, Transfer or Other Dissipation of Mobile Asset Pending Turnover, Memorandum in Support, Declaration of Daniel H. Weiner, Declaration of Jason P.W. Halperin, Proposed Order and Signed Order served on Enrique K. Razon Jr. on 3/31/2021. Service was made by Electronic Mail. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Halperin, Jason)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,. 11 Essex Street Realty LLC served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021; Asia Arrow Limited served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021; Bloomberry Resorts and Hotels Inc. served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021; Bowery Bay LLC served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021; Campanilla LLC served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021; Collingwood Appalachian Minerals, LLC served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021; Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc. served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021; Collingwood Oil & Gas Holdings, LLC served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021; Collingwood USA, Inc. served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021; Ensara LLC served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021; Fesara LLC served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021; Nozar LLC served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021; Enrique K. Razon, Jr. served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021; Rizolina LLC served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021; Sureste Properties, Inc. served on 3/31/2021, answer due 4/21/2021. Service was accepted by Enrique K. Razon, Jr.. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Halperin, Jason)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: WHEREAS, a show cause hearing is scheduled for April 2, 2021, at 11:30 a.m. It is hereby ORDERED that the show cause hearing is RESCHEDULED for April 2, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. The show cause hearing will be telephonic and will occur on the following conference line 888-363-4749, access: 5583333. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be prepared to begin at the scheduled time. ( Telephone Conference set for 4/2/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/1/2021) (cf)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants show cause before this Court, on April 2, 2021, at 11:30 a.m., why a temporary restraining order should not be issued pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65, temporarily prohibiting Defendants from (1) directly or indirectly, transferring, moving, using, interfering with or otherwise changing the location of the Wyoming Gulfstream from Newark International Airport, or taking any steps to facilitate, request, direct or allow its transfer, movement, use, interference with or change of location from Newark International Airport, unless and until otherwise ordered by this Court (as further set forth in this Order.) The show cause hearing will be telephonic and will occur on the following conference line 888-363-4749, access: 5583333. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be prepared to begin at the scheduled time. It is further ORDERED that, by April 1, 2021, Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Order, as well as their motion papers at Docket Nos. 10-12. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/31/2021) (cf)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC. Related Document Number: [ #10 ]..(Halperin, Jason) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLARATION of Daniel H. Weiner in Support re: #10 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on Defendants From Removal, Transfer or Other Dissipation of Mobile Asset Pending Turnover.. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Halperin, Jason)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLARATION of Jason P.W. Halperin in Support re: #10 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on Defendants From Removal, Transfer or Other Dissipation of Mobile Asset Pending Turnover.. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O).(Halperin, Jason)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on Defendants From Removal, Transfer or Other Dissipation of Mobile Asset Pending Turnover. . Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Halperin, Jason)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on Defendants From Removal, Transfer or Other Dissipation of Mobile Asset Pending Turnover. Document filed by Global Gaming Philippines, LLC..(Halperin, Jason) (Refer to ECF Rule 13.19(b) and (c) for directions regarding promptly alerting the court to this filing.)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #14 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 11 Essex Street Realty LLC, Asia Arrow Limited, Bloomberry Resorts and Hotels Inc., Bowery Bay LLC, Campanilla LLC, Collingwood Appalachian Minerals, LLC, Collingwood Brookshire USA, Inc., Collingwood Oil & Gas Holdings, LLC, Collingwood USA, Inc., Ensara LLC, Fesara LLC, Nozar LLC, Enrique K. Razon, Jr., Rizolina LLC, Sureste Properties, Inc...(pc)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jason P.W. Halperin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 09:201;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 09:203;. (pc)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jason P.W. Halperin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: 11 ESSEX STREET REALTY LLC, ASIA ARROW LIMITED, BLOOMBERRY RESORTS AND HOTELS INC., BOWERY BAY LLC, CAMPANILLA LLC, COLLINGWOOD APPALACHIAN MINERALS, LLC, COLLINGWOOD BROOKSHIRE USA, INC., COLLINGWOOD OIL & GAS HOLDINGS, LLC, COLLINGWOOD USA, INC., ENSARA LLC, FESARA LLC, NOZAR LLC, ENRIQUE K. RAZON, JR, RIZOLINA LLC, SURESTE PROPERTIES, INC., GLOBAL GAMING PHILIPPINES, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Joseph R. Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24318714. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by GLOBAL GAMING PHILIPPINES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement a.Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Dunn, Joseph)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Daniel T. Pascucci to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24318548. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by GLOBAL GAMING PHILIPPINES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement a.Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Pascucci, Daniel)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Ira Bodian on behalf of GLOBAL GAMING PHILIPPINES, LLC..(Bodian, Robert)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION of Daniel H. Weiner in Support re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by GLOBAL GAMING PHILIPPINES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D).(Halperin, Jason)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Global Gaming Asset Management, L.P. for GLOBAL GAMING PHILIPPINES, LLC. Document filed by GLOBAL GAMING PHILIPPINES, LLC..(Halperin, Jason)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Halperin, Jason)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ENRIQUE K. RAZON, JR, BLOOMBERRY RESORTS AND HOTELS INC., SURESTE PROPERTIES, INC., COLLINGWOOD OIL & GAS HOLDINGS, LLC, COLLINGWOOD USA, INC., COLLINGWOOD BROOKSHIRE USA, INC., COLLINGWOOD APPALACHIAN MINERALS, LLC, ASIA ARROW LIMITED, RIZOLINA LLC, ENSARA LLC, NOZAR LLC, BOWERY BAY LLC, CAMPANILLA LLC, FESARA LLC, 11 ESSEX STREET REALTY LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by GLOBAL GAMING PHILIPPINES, LLC..(Halperin, Jason)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 11 ESSEX STREET REALTY LLC, ASIA ARROW LIMITED, BLOOMBERRY RESORTS AND HOTELS INC., BOWERY BAY LLC, CAMPANILLA LLC, COLLINGWOOD APPALACHIAN MINERALS, LLC, COLLINGWOOD BROOKSHIRE USA, INC., COLLINGWOOD OIL & GAS HOLDINGS, LLC, COLLINGWOOD USA, INC., ENSARA LLC, FESARA LLC, NOZAR LLC, ENRIQUE K. RAZON, JR, RIZOLINA LLC, SURESTE PROPERTIES, INC.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24316822)Document filed by GLOBAL GAMING PHILIPPINES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2, #3 Appendix 3, #4 Appendix 4).(Halperin, Jason)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Joseph R. Dunn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24318714. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #7 MOTION for Daniel T. Pascucci to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24318548. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Gaming Philippines, LLC v. Razon, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLOBAL GAMING PHILIPPINES, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Thomas Pascucci
Represented By: Robert Ira Bodian
Represented By: Jason P.W. Halperin
Represented By: Joseph R. Dunn
Represented By: Kevin N. Ainsworth
Represented By: Iris Greenquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLLINGWOOD APPALACHIAN MINERALS, LLC
Represented By: Brett Philip Lowe
Represented By: Konor Andrew Cormier
Represented By: Corey J. Seel
Represented By: Diana J. Shelby
Represented By: Michael D. Nolan
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLLINGWOOD OIL & GAS HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Brett Philip Lowe
Represented By: Konor Andrew Cormier
Represented By: Corey J. Seel
Represented By: Diana J. Shelby
Represented By: Michael D. Nolan
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENSARA LLC
Represented By: Brett Philip Lowe
Represented By: Rachel Penski Fissell
Represented By: Michael D. Nolan
Represented By: Daniel Robert Walfish
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FESARA LLC
Represented By: Brett Philip Lowe
Represented By: Rachel Penski Fissell
Represented By: Michael D. Nolan
Represented By: Daniel Robert Walfish
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIZOLINA LLC
Represented By: Brett Philip Lowe
Represented By: Rachel Penski Fissell
Represented By: Michael D. Nolan
Represented By: Daniel Robert Walfish
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMPANILLA LLC
Represented By: Brett Philip Lowe
Represented By: Rachel Penski Fissell
Represented By: Michael D. Nolan
Represented By: Daniel Robert Walfish
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLLINGWOOD USA, INC.
Represented By: Brett Philip Lowe
Represented By: Corey J. Seel
Represented By: Diana J. Shelby
Represented By: Michael D. Nolan
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASIA ARROW LIMITED
Represented By: Brett Philip Lowe
Represented By: Rachel Penski Fissell
Represented By: Michael D. Nolan
Represented By: Daniel Robert Walfish
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 11 ESSEX STREET REALTY LLC
Represented By: Brett Philip Lowe
Represented By: Rachel Penski Fissell
Represented By: Michael D. Nolan
Represented By: Daniel Robert Walfish
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOZAR LLC
Represented By: Brett Philip Lowe
Represented By: Rachel Penski Fissell
Represented By: Michael D. Nolan
Represented By: Daniel Robert Walfish
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENRIQUE K. RAZON, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLLINGWOOD BROOKSHIRE USA, INC.
Represented By: Brett Philip Lowe
Represented By: Konor Andrew Cormier
Represented By: Corey J. Seel
Represented By: Diana J. Shelby
Represented By: Michael D. Nolan
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLOOMBERRY RESORTS AND HOTELS INC.
Represented By: Brett Philip Lowe
Represented By: Michael D. Nolan
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SURESTE PROPERTIES, INC.
Represented By: Brett Philip Lowe
Represented By: Michael D. Nolan
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOWERY BAY LLC
Represented By: Brett Philip Lowe
Represented By: Rachel Penski Fissell
Represented By: Michael D. Nolan
Represented By: Daniel Robert Walfish
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique K. Razon, Jr.
Represented By: Brett Philip Lowe
Represented By: Rachel Penski Fissell
Represented By: Michael D. Nolan
Represented By: Daniel Robert Walfish
Represented By: Daniel Mumford Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?