Hanover Insurance Company v. NY FireTech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O JOSEPH P. DAY REALTY and Hanover Insurance Company
Defendant: NY FIRE, LLC and NY FIRETECH, INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv02728
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. NY FireTech, Inc. served on 4/6/2021, answer due 4/27/2021. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, authorized agent, NY Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Hanover Insurance Company..(Kushnir, Vladislav)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. NY Fire, LLC served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, authorized agent, NY Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Hanover Insurance Company..(Kushnir, Vladislav)
April 3, 2021 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against NY Fire, LLC, NY FireTech, Inc.. Document filed by Hanover Insurance Company..(Kushnir, Vladislav)
April 1, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NY FireTech, Inc...(pc)
April 1, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NY Fire, LLC..(pc)
April 1, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Vladislav Kushnir to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
April 1, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 1, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Vladislav Kushnir. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Civil Miscellaneous Case; Dollar Demand $1,095,000,000; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,100,000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
April 1, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Vladislav Kushnir. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: NY FIRETECH, INC., NY FIRE, LLC, HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O JOSEPH P. DAY REALTY. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hanover Insurance Group for HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O JOSEPH P. DAY REALTY. Document filed by HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O JOSEPH P. DAY REALTY..(Kushnir, Vladislav)
March 31, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NY FIRETECH, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O JOSEPH P. DAY REALTY..(Kushnir, Vladislav)
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NY FIRE, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O JOSEPH P. DAY REALTY..(Kushnir, Vladislav)
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kushnir, Vladislav)
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24329408)Document filed by HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O JOSEPH P. DAY REALTY..(Kushnir, Vladislav) Modified on 4/1/2021 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanover Insurance Company v. NY FireTech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NY FIRE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NY FIRETECH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O JOSEPH P. DAY REALTY
Represented By: Vladislav Kushnir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Vladislav Kushnir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?