Castillo et al v. El San Juan City Island on 5th Ave LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Lora, Mercy Castillo and Ulises Rodriguez
Defendant: Manuel Vidal, "El San Juan" City Island on 5th Ave LLC, Josefina Vidal and El San Juan City Island on 5th Ave LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv02824
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Manuel Vidal served on 4/27/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. Service was accepted by Jane Doe. Document filed by Mercy Castillo; Ulises Rodriguez; Jessica Lora..(Ciliotta, Nicola)
May 24, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Josefina Vidal served on 4/27/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. Service was accepted by Jane Doe. Document filed by Mercy Castillo; Ulises Rodriguez; Jessica Lora..(Ciliotta, Nicola)
May 5, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jessica Lora..(Ciliotta, Nicola)
May 5, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Ulises Rodriguez..(Ciliotta, Nicola)
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Mercy Castillo..(Ciliotta, Nicola)
April 12, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. El San Juan City Island on 5th Ave LLC served on 4/8/2021, answer due 4/29/2021. Service was accepted by Secretary of State. Document filed by Mercy Castillo; Ulises Rodriguez; Jessica Lora..(Ciliotta, Nicola)
April 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicole Deanna Grunfeld on behalf of Mercy Castillo, Jessica Lora, Ulises Rodriguez..(Grunfeld, Nicole)
April 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/3/2021 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/2/2021) (mro)
April 2, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Josefina Vidal..(dnh)
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Manuel Vidal..(dnh)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to El San Juan City Island on 5th Ave LLC..(dnh)
April 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nicola Ciliotta. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Class Action code n (No Class Action Alleged). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Class Action code has been modified to y (Class Action Alleged). (dnh)
April 2, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
April 2, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nicola Ciliotta. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: "El San Juan" City Island on 5th Ave LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered with quotation marks. (dnh)
April 2, 2021 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
April 2, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Josefina Vidal, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mercy Castillo, Jessica Lora, Ulises Rodriguez..(Ciliotta, Nicola)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Manuel Vidal, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mercy Castillo, Jessica Lora, Ulises Rodriguez..(Ciliotta, Nicola)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to "El San Juan" City Island on 5th Ave LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mercy Castillo, Jessica Lora, Ulises Rodriguez..(Ciliotta, Nicola)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ciliotta, Nicola)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against "El San Juan" City Island on 5th Ave LLC, Josefina Vidal, Manuel Vidal. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24342600)Document filed by Mercy Castillo, Ulises Rodriguez, Jessica Lora..(Ciliotta, Nicola)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo et al v. El San Juan City Island on 5th Ave LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Lora
Represented By: Nicola Ciliotta
Represented By: Nicole Deanna Grunfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercy Castillo
Represented By: Nicola Ciliotta
Represented By: Nicole Deanna Grunfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulises Rodriguez
Represented By: Nicola Ciliotta
Represented By: Nicole Deanna Grunfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "El San Juan" City Island on 5th Ave LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josefina Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El San Juan City Island on 5th Ave LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?