Corona Group, LLC v. Park
Plaintiff: Corona Group, LLC
Defendant: Jeff Park
Case Number: 1:2021cv02889
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2021 Filing 13 COMPLAINT against Corona Group, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24607976)Document filed by Corona Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Guaranty of Payment, #2 Exhibit Lease Agreement, #3 Exhibit NYC DOB Final Resolution, #4 Exhibit NYC DOB Certification, #5 Exhibit Photograph of Current Condition).(Buss, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. As stated on the record during the May 7, 2021 teleconference, Plaintiff is directed to file a complaint no later than May 31, 2021. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for May 13, 2021 is adjourned to June 30, 2021 at 9 a.m. The joint status letter and proposed case management plan described in the Court's April 7, 2021 order are due no later than June 23, 2021. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (wv)
May 7, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 5/7/2021. (Court Reporter present) (wv)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The Court will hold a teleconference regarding Defendant's May 4, 2021 letter, Dkt. No. 10, on May 7, 2021 at 9 a.m. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (wv)
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Massimo F. D'Angelo dated May 3, 2021 re: scheduling order. Document filed by Jeff Park..(D'Angelo, Massimo)
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Corona Group, LLC..(Buss, Jeffrey)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey D Buss on behalf of Corona Group, LLC..(Buss, Jeffrey)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Jeff Park.(D'Angelo, Massimo)
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. Initial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/7/2021) (nb)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: This action was removed from the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York, on April 5, 2021. Dkt. No. 1. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(3), if any party wishes to demand a jury trial in this matter, the demand must be served and filed no later than April 19, 2021. Additionally, counsel for Plaintiff is directed to promptly file a notice of appearance in this case. Counsel for Defendant is directed to serve a copy of this order on Plaintiff, and to retain proof of service. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/7/2021) (nb)
April 6, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Massimo Fabio D'Angelo. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $105,968,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $106,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
April 6, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
April 6, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
April 6, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Angad Bhai on behalf of Jeff Park..(Bhai, Angad)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Massimo Fabio D'Angelo on behalf of Jeff Park..(D'Angelo, Massimo)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(D'Angelo, Massimo)
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 651384/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24351997).Document filed by Jeff Park. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G).(D'Angelo, Massimo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corona Group, LLC v. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Park
Represented By: Massimo Fabio D'Angelo
Represented By: Angad Bhai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corona Group, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D Buss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?