Sanchez v. Panda Plates Inc.
Plaintiff: Cristian Sanchez
Defendant: Panda Plates Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03043
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Letter to Judge Lorna Schofield. Document filed by Panda Plates Inc...(Hill, Lucy)
June 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lucy Elizabeth Hill on behalf of Panda Plates Inc...(Hill, Lucy)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the June 10, 2021, initial pretrial conference is cancelled. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/4/2021) (cf)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No additional parties may be joined after or Amended Pleadings may be filed until 7/12/2021. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than 10/18/2021. Depositions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30, 31 shall be completed by 9/16/2021. If you have identified types of experts in question 9(a), all expert discovery shall be completed no later than 12/2/2021. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 3 days. On 12/16/2021 at 10:50 A.M. a pre-motion conference will be held for any anticipated dispositive motions, as further set forth in this Order. A party wishing to file a summary judgment or other dispositive motion shall file a pre-motion letter at least two weeks before the conference and in the form provided in the Court's Individual Rule III.A.1. Any party wishing to oppose shall file a responsive letter as provided in the same Individual Rule. The motion will be discussed at the conference. To join the conference, the parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and use Access Code 558-3333. The time of the conference is approximate, but the parties shall be ready to proceed at that time. Amended Pleadings due by 7/12/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 7/12/2021. Deposition due by 9/16/2021. Fact Discovery due by 10/18/2021. Expert Discovery due by 12/2/2021. Telephone Conference set for 12/16/2021 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/4/2021) (cf)
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by Cristian Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Plan).(Mizrahi, Joseph)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Ilya Schwartzburg dated May 07, 2021. Defendant's application for an extension is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by June 7, 2021. Panda Plates Inc. answer due 6/7/2021 (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/7/2021) (cf)
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Ilya Schwartzburg dated May 07, 2021. Document filed by Panda Plates Inc...(Schwartzburg, Ilya)
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ilya Schwartzburg on behalf of Panda Plates Inc...(Schwartzburg, Ilya)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The conference will be telephonic. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/23/2021) (cf)
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Panda Plates Inc...(pc)
April 9, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Panda Plates Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mizrahi, Joseph)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Panda Plates Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24372040)Document filed by Cristian Sanchez..(Mizrahi, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Panda Plates Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panda Plates Inc.
Represented By: Lucy Elizabeth Hill
Represented By: Ilya Schwartzburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristian Sanchez
Represented By: Joseph H Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?