Unit 3B 11 Beach LLC v. Kim
Plaintiff: Unit 3B 11 Beach LLC
Defendant: David Kim
Case Number: 1:2021cv03068
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 tl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Filing 21 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #20 Letter filed by David Kim. ENDORSEMENT: The application is GRANTED. Defendant may file the below referenced exhibits in their entirety. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/4/2021) (cf)
June 3, 2021 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Steven J. Shore dated June 3, 2021 re: Request to Submit Complete Exhibits. Document filed by David Kim..(Shore, Steven)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #18 Letter filed by Unit 3B 11 Beach LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The proposed briefing schedule is adopted as an Order of the Court. The initial conference scheduled for June 10, 2021, at 10:30 A.M., see Dkt. No. 12, is adjourned sine die. Discovery is stayed pending resolution of Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss. The parties shall comply with the Court's Individual and Emergency Rules concerning motions. (Motions due by 6/7/2021., Responses due by 6/28/2021, Replies due by 7/12/2021.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/18/2021) (cf)
May 17, 2021 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Gary Rosen, Esq. dated May 13, 2021 re: Response to Defendant's pre-motion request. Document filed by Unit 3B 11 Beach LLC..(Rosen, Gary)
May 10, 2021 Filing 17 LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding Defendant's intention to move to dismiss the First Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Steven J. Shore dated May 10, 2021. Document filed by David Kim..(Shore, Steven)
May 7, 2021 Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against David Kim with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Unit 3B 11 Beach LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Rosen, Gary)
April 29, 2021 Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #13 Letter filed by Unit 3B 11 Beach LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The stay imposed by Dkt. No. 10 is lifted. By May 7, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint. Subsequently, if Defendant still intends to file a motion to dismiss in lieu of an answer, Defendant shall file an updated pre-motion letter in compliance with Individual Rule III.C.2. One week after Defendant files such a letter, Plaintiff shall file a letter response with a joint proposed briefing schedule. (Amended Pleadings due by 5/7/2021.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/29/2021) (cf)
April 27, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ira Brad Matetsky on behalf of David Kim..(Matetsky, Ira)
April 26, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Gary Rosen, Esq. dated April 26, 2021 re: Letter identifying citizenship of members of Plaintiff. Document filed by Unit 3B 11 Beach LLC..(Rosen, Gary)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 6/10/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The conference will be telephonic. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/23/2021) (cf)
April 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven J. Shore on behalf of David Kim..(Shore, Steven)
April 22, 2021 Filing 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #9 Response to Motion, filed by Unit 3B 11 Beach LLC. ENDORSEMENT: By April 29, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a letter stating the citizenship of each of its members. See Platinum-Montaur Life Scis., LLC v. Navideo Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., 943 F.3d 613, 615 (2d Cir. 2019). If the members are limited liability entities, Plaintiff shall identify their members until entities recognizable for jurisdictional purposes are identified. Discovery and all motions are stayed pending the Court's determination of whether it has subject matter jurisdiction. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/22/2021) (cf)
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from GARY ROSEN, ESQ. dated APRIL 22, 2021 re: #8 LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding Defendant's intention to move to dismiss the Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Steven J. Shore dated April 21, 2021. . Document filed by Unit 3B 11 Beach LLC..(Rosen, Gary)
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Conference regarding Defendant's intention to move to dismiss the Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Steven J. Shore dated April 21, 2021. Document filed by David Kim..(Francis, Jeremy)
April 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Bradford Francis on behalf of David Kim..(Francis, Jeremy)
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. David Kim waiver sent on 4/9/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. Document filed by Unit 3B 11 Beach LLC..(Rosen, Gary)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Kim..(dnh)
April 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gary Scott Rosen. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code e (Exempt); Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
April 9, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
April 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
April 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Kim, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Unit 3B 11 Beach LLC..(Rosen, Gary)
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rosen, Gary)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Unit 3B 11 Beach LLC..(Rosen, Gary)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Kim. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24373180)Document filed by Unit 3B 11 Beach LLC..(Rosen, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unit 3B 11 Beach LLC v. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unit 3B 11 Beach LLC
Represented By: Gary Scott Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kim
Represented By: Ira Brad Matetsky
Represented By: Steven J. Shore
Represented By: Jeremy Bradford Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?