Shabazz et al v. New York City Campaign Finance Board et al
Plaintiff: Sonya Harvey, Rosa Sanchez, Malikah Shabazz and Frank Taylor
Defendant: City of New York, Hillary Weisman, Amy M. Loprest and New York City Campaign Finance Board
Intervenor: Hiram Monserrate
Case Number: 1:2021cv03069
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) City of New York, Amy M. Loprest, New York City Campaign Finance Board, Hillary Weisman. Document filed by Frank Taylor, Malikah Shabazz, Rosa Sanchez, Sonya Harvey. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Green, Remy)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Initial Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for May 21, 2021 at 12:00PM is CANCELLED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf)
May 18, 2021 Filing 25 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) City of New York, Amy M. Loprest, Hillary Weisman. Document filed by Frank Taylor, Malikah Shabazz, Rosa Sanchez, Sonya Harvey. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Green, Remy) Modified on 5/18/2021 (dt).
May 18, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Remy Green. RE-FILE Document No. #25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (dt)
April 23, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Oral Argument held on 4/23/2021 re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Frank Taylor, Malikah Shabazz, Rosa Sanchez, Sonya Harvey. Remy Green present by telephone for Plaintiffs. Stephen Kitzinger present by telephone for Defendants. Court reporter present by telephone. The Court heard argument from Plaintiffs and Defendants in regard to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction is denied. (mf)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. For the reasons stated at the conference held today, April 23, 2021, Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction, at Dkt. No. 4, is DENIED. The Court will hold an initial pretrial conference at 12:00 p.m. on May 21, 2021. The parties are directed, by one week before that conference, to file a proposed case management plan and scheduling order pursuant to the Court's individual practices. As stated at conference, Defendants' time to answer the Complaint is ADJOURNED pending further order of the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/23/2021) (va)
April 23, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 5/21/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (va)
April 21, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Sonya Harvey, Rosa Sanchez, Malikah Shabazz, Frank Taylor..(Green, Remy)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Oral Argument scheduled for April 23, 2021 is MOVED to 10:30AM. Parties are reminded to dial into the Court's teleconference line at 888-251-2909 and use access code 2123101. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf)
April 20, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 4/23/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
April 19, 2021 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by City of New York, Amy M. Loprest, New York City Campaign Finance Board, Hillary Weisman..(Kitzinger, Stephen)
April 19, 2021 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Stephen Kitzinger in Opposition re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by City of New York, Amy M. Loprest, New York City Campaign Finance Board, Hillary Weisman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Petition).(Kitzinger, Stephen)
April 19, 2021 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Danielle Willemin in Opposition re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by City of New York, Amy M. Loprest, New York City Campaign Finance Board, Hillary Weisman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Nonpayment determination).(Kitzinger, Stephen)
April 19, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Edward Kitzinger on behalf of City of New York, Amy M. Loprest, New York City Campaign Finance Board, Hillary Weisman..(Kitzinger, Stephen)
April 19, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of withdraw notice of appearance. Document filed by Sonya Harvey, Rosa Sanchez, Malikah Shabazz, Frank Taylor..(Cruz, Angel)
April 15, 2021 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Rocco G. Avallone dated 4-15-2021 re: withdrawal of Motion to Intervene. Document filed by Hiram Monserrate..(Avallone, Rocco)
April 13, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Telephone Conference held on 4/13/2021 in re: (dkt. #4) Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Angel Cruz and Remy Green present by telephone for Plaintiffs. Stephen Kitzinger present by telephone for Defendants. Rocco Avallone present by telephone for Intervenor. Court reporter present by telephone. Defendants opposition briefs due by April 19, 2021 at 5:00PM. Plaintiffs reply briefs due by April 21, 2021. Telephonic Oral Argument set for April 23, 2021 at 12:00PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf) Modified on 4/15/2021 (mf).
April 13, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 4/23/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (mf)
April 13, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Memo of Law, and Proposed Complaint served on New York City Campaign Finance Board; Amy M. Loprest; Hillary Weisman; City of New York; New York City Board of Elections on 4/13/21. Service was made by email. Document filed by Hiram Monserrate..(Avallone, Rocco)
April 12, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene . Document filed by Hiram Monserrate. Return Date set for 4/13/2021 at 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint In Intervention).(Avallone, Rocco)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER The Court construes Monserrates letter as an application for leave to file a motion to intervene and complaint. Monserrate has leave to file a motion to intervene and proposed complaint which the Court will address at tomorrows conference assuming it is filed before then. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (wt)
April 12, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Rocco G. Avallone dated 4-12-21 re: Intervention. Document filed by Hiram Monserrate..(Avallone, Rocco)
April 10, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Angel Cruz on behalf of Sonya Harvey, Rosa Sanchez, Malikah Shabazz, Frank Taylor..(Cruz, Angel)
April 9, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Complaint; Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Court's Order at ECF 10 served on New York City Campaign Finance Board, Amy M. Loprest, Hillary Weisman, and the City of New York. on 2021-04-09. Service was made by EMAIL. Document filed by Sonya Harvey, Rosa Sanchez, Malikah Shabazz, Frank Taylor..(Green, Remy)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting in part #3 Letter Motion to ExpeditePlaintiff's motion for alternative service, at Dkt. No. 3, is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve Defendants by the means described in its motion by 5:00 p.m. today, April 9, 2021. The Court will take Plaintiff's motion for an accelerated briefing schedule under advisement; the Court will hold a conference by TELEPHONE at 10:00 a.m. on April 13, 2021 at which it will address the briefing schedule on Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. At that date and time the parties are directed to dial the Court's conference line at 888-251-2909 (access code: 2123101). Plaintiff is ORDERED to notify Defendants of the conference date, time, and dial-in information. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (wt)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Malikah Shabazz in Support re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Sonya Harvey, Rosa Sanchez, Malikah Shabazz, Frank Taylor..(Green, Remy)
April 9, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Rosa Sanchez in Support re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Sonya Harvey, Rosa Sanchez, Malikah Shabazz, Frank Taylor..(Green, Remy)
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Sonya Harvey in Support re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Sonya Harvey, Rosa Sanchez, Malikah Shabazz, Frank Taylor..(Green, Remy)
April 9, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Frank Taylor in Support re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Sonya Harvey, Rosa Sanchez, Malikah Shabazz, Frank Taylor..(Green, Remy)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Sonya Harvey, Rosa Sanchez, Malikah Shabazz, Frank Taylor..(Green, Remy)
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Sonya Harvey, Rosa Sanchez, Malikah Shabazz, Frank Taylor..(Green, Remy)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER MOTION to Expedite and for Alternate Service and Accelerated Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Remy Green dated 2021-04-09. Document filed by Sonya Harvey, Rosa Sanchez, Malikah Shabazz, Frank Taylor..(Green, Remy)
April 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Remy Green. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
April 9, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh)
April 9, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
April 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Green, Remy)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of New York, Amy M. Loprest, New York City Campaign Finance Board, Hillary Weisman. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24373273)Document filed by Frank Taylor, Malikah Shabazz, Rosa Sanchez, Sonya Harvey..(Green, Remy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shabazz et al v. New York City Campaign Finance Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Harvey
Represented By: Remy Green
Represented By: Angel Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Sanchez
Represented By: Remy Green
Represented By: Angel Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malikah Shabazz
Represented By: Remy Green
Represented By: Angel Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Taylor
Represented By: Remy Green
Represented By: Angel Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Stephen Edward Kitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillary Weisman
Represented By: Stephen Edward Kitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy M. Loprest
Represented By: Stephen Edward Kitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Campaign Finance Board
Represented By: Stephen Edward Kitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Hiram Monserrate
Represented By: Rocco G Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?