Johnson v. Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Bradley Johnson
Defendant: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company and AXIS Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv03262
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike. Document filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Certificate of Service).(Schiller, Ronald)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DECLARATION of Andrew M. Harris in Support re: #34 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excess Coverage Insurance Policy).(Harris, Andrew)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #34 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Illinois Union Insurance Company..(Harris, Andrew)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Illinois Union Insurance Company..(Harris, Andrew)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by AXIS Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Declaration of Andrew L. Margulis, #3 Exhibit 1--Policy).(Margulis, Andrew)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Michael Adrian on behalf of Bradley Johnson..(Adrian, James)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. The deadline for Ironshore to file its partial motion to dismiss and motion to strike is extended to June 11, 2021. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 30. Motions due by 6/11/2021.. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/4/2021) (rro)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Request to Extend Time to File Partial Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Ronald P. Schiller dated June 4, 2021. Document filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order).(Schiller, Ronald)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Jason M. Russell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/17/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/17/2021 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/23/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Jason M. Russell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24619224. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason M. Russell, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing (PA), #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing (NJ), #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Russell, Jason)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #26 MOTION for Jason M. Russell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24619224. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion for David Newmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 . On May 14, 2021, Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company (Illinois Union) filed a pre-motion letter requesting a conference to discuss its anticipated motion to dismiss. Dkt. No. 19. On May 17, 2021, the Court held a teleconference with the parties at which it discussed, inter alia, Defendants anticipated motions to dismiss. Accordingly, Illinois Unions request is granted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #23 MOTION for David Newmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24588229. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for David Newmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24588229. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Illinois Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Newmann, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing (PA), #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing (IL), #4 Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing (DC), #5 Text of Proposed Order).(Newmann, David)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Pacific Employers Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Ace American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate INA Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate INA Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate INA Corporation for Illinois Union Insurance Company. Document filed by Illinois Union Insurance Company..(Harris, Andrew)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. On May 17, 2021, the Court held a teleconference with the parties. As stated on the record, Defendants motions to dismiss are due no later than June 7, 2021; Plaintiffs oppositions are due no later than four weeks after service of Defendants motions; Defendants replies, if any, are due no later than two weeks following service of Plaintiffs oppositions. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods) (Text Only Order) (wv)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 5/17/2021. (Court Reporter present) (wv)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Andrew M. Harris to RE-FILE Document #20 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Pacific Employers Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate INA Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate INA Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate INA Corporation for Illinois Union Insurance Company. Document filed by Illinois Union Insurance Company..(Harris, Andrew) Modified on 5/17/2021 (ldi).
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Conference Request for Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Andrew M. Harris dated May 14, 2021. Document filed by Illinois Union Insurance Company..(Harris, Andrew)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 and #17 . Defendants' requests for a pre-motion conference, Dkt. Nos. 16 and 17, are granted. The Court will hold a teleconference concerning the issues raised in Defendants' letters on May 17, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER MOTION for Conference Request for Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Andrew L. Margulis dated 5/13/2021. Document filed by AXIS Insurance Company..(Margulis, Andrew)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Conference Request for Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Ronald P. Schiller dated May 13, 2021. Document filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company..(Schiller, Ronald)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Bonnie M. Hoffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice served on Counsel for Plaintiff, Counsel for Defendant AXIS Insurance Company, and Counsel for Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company on April 30, 2021. Document filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company..(Hoffman, Bonnie)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT MOTION for Bonnie M. Hoffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24477200. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order).(Hoffman, Bonnie)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 CONSENT MOTION for Bonnie M. Hoffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24477200. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. The initial pre-trial conference set for June 21, 2021 is adjourned to June 24, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The joint status letter and case management plan described in the Court's April 15, 2021 order, Dkt. No. 4, are due no later than June 17, 2021. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/23/2021) (vfr)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (vfr)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Request to Reschedule Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Ronald P. Schiller dated April 23, 2021. Document filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order).(Schiller, Ronald)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Axis Specialty US Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent AXIS Specialty Global Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Axis Capital Holdings Limited for AXIS Insurance Company. Document filed by AXIS Insurance Company..(Margulis, Andrew)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and Court's Individual Rules served on Counsel for Plaintiff, Counsel for Defendant AXIS Insurance Company, and Counsel for Defendant Illinois Union Insurance Company on April 16, 2021 and April 19, 2021. Service was made by Email and Mail. Document filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company..(Schiller, Ronald)
April 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to May 14, 2021. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/17/2021) (tro)
April 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: AXIS Insurance Company answer due 5/14/2021; Illinois Union Insurance Company answer due 5/14/2021; Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company answer due 5/14/2021. (tro)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Ironshore Holdings (U.S.) Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. for Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. Document filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company..(Schiller, Ronald)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Request to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Ronald P. Schiller dated April 16, 2021. Document filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order).(Schiller, Ronald)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Leslie Margulis on behalf of AXIS Insurance Company..(Margulis, Andrew)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Ronald Paltin Schiller to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The conferencewill be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light ofCOVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevantinstructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court'sEmergency Rules. Initial Conference set for 6/21/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/15/2021) (nb) Modified on 4/19/2021 (nb).
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ironshore Holdings (U.S.) Inc. for Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. Document filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company..(Schiller, Ronald) Modified on 4/16/2021 (ldi).
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schiller, Ronald)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 651563/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24398878).Document filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Certificate of Service).(Schiller, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald Paltin Schiller
Represented By: Bonnie M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Represented By: David Newmann
Represented By: Jason Michael Russell
Represented By: Andrew M. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXIS Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew Leslie Margulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Johnson
Represented By: James Michael Adrian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?