IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC v. First Landing Fund, LLC et al
Plaintiff: IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC
Defendant: First Landing Fund, LLC, Prophecy Special Opportunities Fund, LP, Prophecy Special Ops GP, LLC, David Schippers, Vantage Consulting Group, Inc., Jeffrey Spotts, Mark T. Finn and David P. Schippers
Case Number: 1:2021cv03263
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Aaron M. Cohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (jcs)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Aaron M. Cohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Aaron M. Cohn, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of California, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - DC, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of Florida, #5 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Cohn, Aaron)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #30 MOTION for Aaron M. Cohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Falk Wernick on behalf of Jeffrey Spotts..(Wernick, Melissa)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee David Vartan on behalf of Jeffrey Spotts..(Vartan, Lee)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #27 MOTION for Aaron M. Cohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24525291. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California an Florida;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Aaron M. Cohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24525291. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Aaron M. Cohn, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - California, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - DC -, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Florida, #5 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Cohn, Aaron) Modified on 5/12/2021 (wb).
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' request for an extension is GRANTED even though it is untimely per Individual Rule I.B.2. All defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by July 12, 2021. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/7/2021) (cf)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Mark T. Finn answer due 7/12/2021; First Landing Fund, LLC answer due 7/12/2021; Prophecy Special Opportunities Fund, LP answer due 7/12/2021; Prophecy Special Ops GP, LLC answer due 7/12/2021; David P. Schippers answer due 7/12/2021; Jeffrey Spotts answer due 7/12/2021; Vantage Consulting Group, Inc. answer due 7/12/2021. (cf)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Marion R. Harris and Jason D. Frank dated May 7, 2021. Document filed by Mark T. Finn, First Landing Fund, LLC, David P. Schippers, Vantage Consulting Group, Inc...(Harris, Marion)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jeffrey Spotts served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. Service was accepted by Jeffrey Spotts, individual Defendant. Document filed by IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC..(Silver, Scott)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Vantage Consulting Group, Inc. served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. Service was accepted by J. Britton Williston, Registered Agent. Document filed by IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC..(Silver, Scott)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mark T. Finn served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. Service was accepted by Mark Finn, individual Defendant. Document filed by IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC..(Silver, Scott)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. David P. Schippers served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. Service was accepted by David Schippers, individual Defendant. Document filed by IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC..(Silver, Scott)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Prophecy Special Ops GP, LLC served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. Service was accepted by Casey Pineda, Managing Agent. Document filed by IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC..(Silver, Scott)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Prophecy Special Opportunities Fund, LP served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. Service was accepted by Casey Pineda, Managing Agent. Document filed by IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC..(Silver, Scott)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. First Landing Fund, LLC served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. Service was accepted by Amy Mclaren, Managing Agent. Document filed by IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC..(Silver, Scott)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/5/2021 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The conference will be telephonic. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/23/2021) (cf)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vantage Consulting Group, Inc.. (sj)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Prophecy Special Ops GP, LLC. (sj)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Prophecy Special Opportunities Fund, LP. (sj)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark T. Finn. (sj)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffrey Spotts. (sj)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to First Landing Fund, LLC. (sj)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David P. Schippers. (sj)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vantage Consulting Group, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC..(Silver, Scott)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Prophecy Special Ops GP, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC..(Silver, Scott)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Prophecy Special Opportunities Fund, LP, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC..(Silver, Scott)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark T. Finn, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC..(Silver, Scott)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jeffrey Spotts, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC..(Silver, Scott)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to First Landing Fund, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC..(Silver, Scott)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David P. Schippers, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC..(Silver, Scott)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Scott Lance Silver. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $4,000,000,000; County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $4,000,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sj)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Scott Lance Silver. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: David P. Schippers. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (sj)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Silver, Scott)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark T. Finn, First Landing Fund, LLC, Prophecy Special Opportunities Fund, LP, Prophecy Special Ops GP, LLC, David Schippers, Jeffrey Spotts, Vantage Consulting Group, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24399028)Document filed by IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15).(Silver, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC v. First Landing Fund, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Landing Fund, LLC
Represented By: Marion Ramsey Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prophecy Special Opportunities Fund, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prophecy Special Ops GP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Schippers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vantage Consulting Group, Inc.
Represented By: Marion Ramsey Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Spotts
Represented By: Lee David Vartan
Represented By: Melissa Falk Wernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T. Finn
Represented By: Marion Ramsey Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P. Schippers
Represented By: Marion Ramsey Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IMG Memorial Fund 1, LLC
Represented By: Scott Lance Silver
Represented By: Aaron Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?