Bellis v. New York City Department of Education
Plaintiff: Richard Bellis
Defendant: NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Case Number: 1:2021cv03282
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/17/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 1, 2021 Filing 11 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/17/2021 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/22/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/2/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 30, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/13/2021. Replies due by 9/3/2021. (rjm)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to file a Motion to Dismiss, for a Stay of Discovery, and for an Adjournment of the Initial Conference addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Alison S. Mitchell dated April 30, 2021. Document filed by New York City Department of Education. Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 9. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 7/1/2021.) (The following hearing(s) was terminated: Initial Conference.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/30/2021) (rjm)
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to file a Motion to Dismiss, for a Stay of Discovery, and for an Adjournment of the Initial Conference addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Alison S. Mitchell dated April 30, 2021. Document filed by New York City Department of Education..(Mitchell, Alison)
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. New York City Department of Education served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. Document filed by Richard Bellis..(Perry, Davida)
April 28, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of copy of Order of 4-16-21 served on John Walpole on April 28, 2021. Service was made by email. Document filed by Richard Bellis..(Heller, Brian)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/27/2021 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/16/2021) (cf)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education..(gp)
April 16, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
April 16, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
April 16, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
April 16, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Davida Perry. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: New York City Department of Education. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (gp)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Bellis..(Perry, Davida)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Adam Heller on behalf of Richard Bellis..(Heller, Brian)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Perry, Davida)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24401399)Document filed by Richard Bellis..(Perry, Davida)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellis v. New York City Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bellis
Represented By: Davida S. Perry
Represented By: Brian Adam Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Alison Sue Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?