Korovin v. Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc.
Plaintiff: Eugene Korovin
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03294
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Samuel J. Rubin dated June 3, 2021 re: notice of related case. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc...(Rubin, Samuel)
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc.. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc...(Rubin, Samuel)
May 12, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Samuel Joseph Rubin to RE-FILE Document #6 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
May 10, 2021 Mailed a copy of #7 Memo Endorsement, to Eugene Korovin at 2872 Gaynor Ave., Richmond, CA 94804. (dsh)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: #2 Letter, filed by Eugene Korovin. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's request for an extension to pay the required court filing fee is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have until June 30, 2021 to make the payment. Plaintiff is advised that the case will not proceed until the fee is paid. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/7/2021) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc...(Rubin, Samuel) Modified on 5/12/2021 (ldi).
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth M. Zito on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc...(Zito, Elizabeth)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Joseph Rubin on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc...(Rubin, Samuel)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marshall Howard Fishman on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc...(Fishman, Marshall)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from E. Korovin, dated 5/5/21 re: I request postponement or waiver for the Court fee. I have filed a complaint by email as I am currently in Russia because of a health emergency of my parents etc. I am planning to return to California on 6/21/21. Please allow me to mail the money order when I get back or waive the fee based on those circumstances. Document filed by Eugene Korovin.(sc)
April 16, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-07619-ALC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
April 16, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
April 16, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc.. Document filed by Eugene Korovin..(rdz)
April 14, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Korovin v. Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Marshall Howard Fishman
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Zito
Represented By: Samuel Joseph Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Korovin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?