Davis v. Sheltering Arms Children and Family Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tracey Davis
Defendant: Jamila Pratt, Edwards Lawrence, Jermaine Miller, Denise Forest, Shaun Ravanel and Sheltering Arms Children and Family Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03359
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12111
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa Alexis Rodriguez on behalf of Tracey Davis..(Rodriguez, Melissa)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/28/2021) (kv)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/28/2021) (kv)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court at 10:40 a.m. on September 9, 2021, to be held telephonically. The parties are directed to dial 888-398-2342 or 215-861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF. All pre-trial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Initial Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 10:40 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/28/2021) (kv)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Denise Forest, Edwards Lawrence, Jermaine Miller, Jamila Pratt, Shaun Ravanel, Sheltering Arms Children and Family Services, Inc.. (sj)
April 19, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
April 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
April 19, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
April 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Christopher J. Berlingieri. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jamila Pratt, Jermaine Miller, Denise Forest, Shaun Ravanel, Edwards Lawrence. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text contained a typographical error. (sj)
April 19, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Christopher J. Berlingieri re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; Jamila Pratt, Jermaine Miller, Denise Forest, Shaun Ravenel and Edwards Lawrence must be added again with party text 'in their professional capacities'. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (sj)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHELTERING ARMS CHILDREN AND FAMILY SERVICES INC., JAMILA PRATT, JERMAINE MILLER, DENISE FOREST, SHAUN RAVANEL, and EDWARDS LAWRENCE, in their personal and professional capacities, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Tracey Davis..(Berlingieri, Christopher)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Berlingieri, Christopher)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Denise Forest, Edwards Lawrence, Jermaine Miller, Jamila Pratt, Shaun Ravanel, Sheltering Arms Children and Family Services, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24410580)Document filed by Tracey Davis..(Berlingieri, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Sheltering Arms Children and Family Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamila Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwards Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jermaine Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Forest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Ravanel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheltering Arms Children and Family Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey Davis
Represented By: Christopher J. Berlingieri
Represented By: Melissa Alexis Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?