Ackerman v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Janet Ackerman
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc., HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C., Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC, Hachette Book Group, Inc, Simon & Schuster, Inc. and Penguin Random House LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv03411
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Debra C Freeman
Referring Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Janet Ackerman. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Landau, Kevin)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/26/2021) (kv)
April 30, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
April 30, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea)
April 30, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-00351-GHW-DCF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
April 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Kevin Landau. RE-FILE Document No. #16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (dt)
April 27, 2021 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Janet Ackerman. Document filed by Janet Ackerman. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Landau, Kevin) Modified on 4/30/2021 (dt).
April 20, 2021 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Simon & Schuster, Inc...(dnh)
April 20, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Penguin Random House LLC..(dnh)
April 20, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC..(dnh)
April 20, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C...(dnh)
April 20, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hachette Book Group, Inc..(dnh)
April 20, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amazon.Com, Inc...(dnh)
April 20, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Gregory H. Woods as possibly related to 1:21-cv-00351-GHW-DCF. (dnh)
April 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kevin Sylvan Landau. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Kings. (dnh)
April 20, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(dnh)
April 20, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Simon & Schuster, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Janet Ackerman..(Landau, Kevin)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Penguin Random House LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Janet Ackerman..(Landau, Kevin)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Janet Ackerman..(Landau, Kevin)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Janet Ackerman..(Landau, Kevin)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hachette Book Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Janet Ackerman..(Landau, Kevin)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amazon.com, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Janet Ackerman..(Landau, Kevin)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-00351-GHW-DCF. Document filed by Janet Ackerman..(Landau, Kevin)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit A to Civil Coversheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit B to Civil Coversheet).(Landau, Kevin)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon.Com, Inc., Hachette Book Group, Inc, HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C., Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC, Penguin Random House LLC, Simon & Schuster, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24417774)Document filed by Janet Ackerman..(Landau, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ackerman v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HarperCollins Publishers L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macmillan Publishing Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hachette Book Group, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon & Schuster, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penguin Random House LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Ackerman
Represented By: Kevin Sylvan Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?