Epps et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Epps and Charlie Epps
Defendant: Dr. Shunjin Xia, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and MD Shujin Xia
Case Number: 1:2021cv03416
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 22 U.S.C. ยง 2702
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, Shujin Xia..(jgo)
June 2, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and SHUJIN XIA, M.D.,, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Brenda Epps, Charlie Epps..(Giuffra, Thomas)
May 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas Peter Giuffra to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Defendant party name error listed on summons. Defendant name must match pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America; Dr. Shujin Xia, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Brenda Epps, Charlie Epps..(Giuffra, Thomas) Modified on 5/26/2021 (vf).
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/9/2021 at 11:30 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 3416. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/20/2021) (ks)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against United States of America, Shunjin Xia. Document filed by Brenda Epps, Charlie Epps. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Giuffra, Thomas)
May 17, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Laura Taylor Swain is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
May 17, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
May 17, 2021 Transmission to Case Assignment Clerk. Transmitted re: #1 Amended Civil Case Administrative Closing Order to the Case Assignment Clerk for preparation of notice of case assignment/reassignment..(gp)
May 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas Peter Giuffra to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; the All Plaintiff radio button was selected; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
May 17, 2021 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #3 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-24418134, paid on 4/19/2021. (sj)
May 17, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas Peter Giuffra to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Plaintiff radio button was selected; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #3 Complaint against All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Brenda Epps, Charlie Epps. Related document: #3 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(Giuffra, Thomas) Modified on 4/30/2021 (gp).
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Brenda Epps, Charlie Epps..(Giuffra, Thomas) Modified on 4/30/2021 (gp).
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPLICATION TO REOPEN CASE: Pursuant to Amended Standing Order (15-MC-131):. The deficiency(ies) has been cured and the party(ies) seek to reopen the civil case..(Giuffra, Thomas)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 6/28/2021. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/14/2021) (gp)
April 27, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
April 27, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
April 20, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas Peter Giuffra to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 4/26/2021. (sj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epps et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Shunjin Xia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Shujin Xia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Epps
Represented By: Thomas Peter Giuffra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Epps
Represented By: Thomas Peter Giuffra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?