Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. PF Commercial Flooring, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund and Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
Defendant: Absolute Flooring Inc. and PF Commercial Flooring, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03539
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to PF Commercial Flooring, Ltd., issued May 24, 2021.(dt)
May 24, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Absolute Flooring Inc., issued May 24, 2021.(dt)
May 24, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION of John M. Harras, Esq. in Support re: #11 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,,. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Harras, John)
May 24, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Harras, John) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 5/24/2021 (dt).
May 24, 2021 Filing 10 DECLARATION of John M. Harras, Esq. in Support re: #9 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,,. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Harras, John)
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Harras, John) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 5/24/2021 (dt).
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The conference will be telephonic. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/24/2021) (cf)
April 23, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. PF Commercial Flooring, Ltd. served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, authorized person in the Corporation Department of State. Document filed by Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund; Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund..(Harras, John)
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Absolute Flooring Inc. served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, authorized person in the Corporation Department of State. Document filed by Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund; Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York; Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund..(Harras, John)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Absolute Flooring Inc., PF Commercial Flooring, Ltd...(pc)
April 22, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 22, 2021 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 22, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 21, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Harras, John)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PF Commercial Flooring, Ltd. and Absolute Flooring Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund..(Harras, John)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Harras, John)
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Absolute Flooring Inc., PF Commercial Flooring, Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24432496)Document filed by Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund..(Harras, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. PF Commercial Flooring, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Flooring Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PF Commercial Flooring, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenter Contractor Alliance of Metropolitan New York
Represented By: John Martin Harras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund
Represented By: John Martin Harras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
Represented By: John Martin Harras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?