Rodriguez v. Taco Mix LLC et al
Plaintiff: Maximinio Rodriguez
Defendant: Taco Mix II LLC, Taco Mix Staten Island LLC, Taco Mix III LLC, Joana Sanchez, Alejo Sanchez, Jorge Sanchez, Taco Mix Brooklyn LLC and Taco Mix LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv03644
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Alejo Sanchez waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/9/2021; Joana Sanchez waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/9/2021; Jorge Sanchez waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/9/2021; Taco Mix Brooklyn LLC waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/9/2021; Taco Mix II LLC waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/9/2021; Taco Mix III LLC waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/9/2021; Taco Mix LLC waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/9/2021; Taco Mix Staten Island LLC waiver sent on 6/8/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. Document filed by Maximinio Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Stipulation).(Madzelan, Matthew)
May 4, 2021 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Taco Mix Staten Island LLC..(gp)
May 4, 2021 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alejo Sanchez..(gp)
May 4, 2021 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jorge Sanchez..(gp)
May 4, 2021 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joana Sanchez..(gp)
May 3, 2021 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joana Sanchez, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maximinio Rodriguez..(Madzelan, Matthew)
May 3, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jorge Sanchez, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maximinio Rodriguez..(Madzelan, Matthew)
May 3, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejo Sanchez, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maximinio Rodriguez..(Madzelan, Matthew)
May 3, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Taco Mix Staten Island LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maximinio Rodriguez..(Madzelan, Matthew)
April 30, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Taco Mix III LLC..(dnh)
April 30, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Taco Mix LLC..(dnh)
April 30, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Taco Mix II LLC..(dnh)
April 30, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Taco Mix Brooklyn LLC..(dnh)
April 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Matthew Paul Madzelan to RE-FILE Document No. #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the party name as to whom the summons is being issued must be listed first in the defendant 'To:' section. 'As to' Error; party name contains a typographical error. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
April 29, 2021 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jorge Sanchez, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maximinio Rodriguez..(Madzelan, Matthew) Modified on 4/30/2021 (dnh).
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joana Sanchez, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maximinio Rodriguez..(Madzelan, Matthew) Modified on 4/30/2021 (dnh).
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejo Sanchez, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maximinio Rodriguez..(Madzelan, Matthew) Modified on 4/30/2021 (dnh).
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Taco Mix III LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maximinio Rodriguez..(Madzelan, Matthew)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Taco Mix II LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maximinio Rodriguez..(Madzelan, Matthew)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Taco Mix LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maximinio Rodriguez..(Madzelan, Matthew)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Taco Mix Staten Island, PLLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maximinio Rodriguez..(Madzelan, Matthew) Modified on 4/30/2021 (dnh).
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Taco Mix Brooklyn LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maximinio Rodriguez..(Madzelan, Matthew)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Madzelan, Matthew)
April 29, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq)
April 29, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Philip M. Halpern is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
April 26, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Matthew Paul Madzelan. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
April 26, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 26, 2021 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 26, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alejo Sanchez, Joana Sanchez, Jorge Sanchez, Taco Mix Brooklyn LLC, Taco Mix II LLC, Taco Mix III LLC, Taco Mix LLC, Taco Mix Staten Island LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24445379)Document filed by Maximinio Rodriguez..(Madzelan, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Taco Mix LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Mix II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Mix Staten Island LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Mix III LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joana Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejo Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Mix Brooklyn LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Mix LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maximinio Rodriguez
Represented By: Matthew Paul Madzelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?