Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO et al v. Precision Interiors Corp.
Petitioner: Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Local Union 1974 Benefit Funds and Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO
Respondent: Precision Interiors Corp. a/k/a Precision Interior Construction Corp., Precision Interiors Corp. and Precision Interior Construction Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03704
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #10 Memorandum & Opinion, It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated June 3, 2021, the Petition is GRANTED and the Award is CONFIRMED; judgment is entered in favor of Petitioners and against Respondent as follows: (i) Precision shall pay $502.11 to Jorge Avila; (ii) Precision shall pay $502.11 to Thomas Tejada; (iii) Precision shall pay $502.11 to Wilmer Rauda; (iv) Precision shall pay $719.23 to the Local 1974 Benefit Funds; (v) Precision shall pay $4,000 to the Joint Trade Board of the Drywall Taping Industry; and (vi) Precision shall pay attorneys fees and costs incurred in connection with the Petition as well as any costs incurred in enforcing the judgment entered by the Court; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 6/3/2021) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal) (dt)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION & ORDER: For the reasons stated above, the Petition is GRANTED and the Award is CONFIRMED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Petitioners and against Respondent as follows: (i) Precision shall pay $502.11 to Jorge Avila; (ii) Precision shall pay $502.11 to Thomas Tejada; (iii) Precision shall pay $502.11 to Wilmer Rauda; (iv) Precision shall pay $719.23 to the Local 1974 Benefit Funds; (v) Precision shall pay $4,000 to the Joint Trade Board of the Drywall Taping Industry; and (vi) Precision shall pay attorneys' fees and costs incurred in connection with the Petition as well as any costs incurred in enforcing the judgment entered by the Court. The Clerk of Court is also respectfully directed to close the action. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 6/3/2021) (rro) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
May 17, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Court Order served on Precision Interiors Corp. on 5/14/2021. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO, Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Local Union 1974 Benefit Funds..(Kugielska, Lauren)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Respondent's opposition to the petition, if any, is due on May 19, 2021. Petitioners' reply, if any, is due May 26, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners shall serve a copy of this Order on Respondent. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 5/19/2021, Replies due by 5/26/2021.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 5/14/2021) (ama)
May 12, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Petition and Summons served on Precision Interiors Corp. on 4/28/2021. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO, Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Local Union 1974 Benefit Funds..(Kugielska, Lauren)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Precision Interiors Corp...(jgo)
April 27, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 27, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
April 27, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
April 27, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lauren Michelle Kugielska. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Precision Interiors Corp. a/k/a Precision Interior Construction Corp.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was modified to add alias separately. (jgo)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kugielska, Lauren)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO, Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Local Union 1974 Benefit Funds..(Kugielska, Lauren)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Precision Interiors Corp. a/k/a Precision Interior Construction Corp., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO, Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Local Union 1974 Benefit Funds..(Kugielska, Lauren)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Lauren Kugielska in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,. Document filed by Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO, Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Local Union 1974 Benefit Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Decision & Award, #2 Exhibit B-Trade Agreement, #3 Exhibit C-Demand for Arbitration, #4 Exhibit D-Decision Cover Letter, #5 Exhibit E-Demand Letter).(Kugielska, Lauren)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24454644).Document filed by Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO, Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Local Union 1974 Benefit Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Memorandum of Law).(Kugielska, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO et al v. Precision Interiors Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees of the Drywall Tapers and Pointers Local Union 1974 Benefit Funds
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Kugielska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Drywall Tapers and Pointers of Greater New York Local Union 1974, Affiliated with International Union of Allied Painters and Allied Trades, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Kugielska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Precision Interiors Corp. a/k/a Precision Interior Construction Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Precision Interiors Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Precision Interior Construction Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?