Tetley et al v. Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP
Plaintiff: Brian E. McCrossin, Thomas W. Seiler, Gary Tetley, Thomas R. Seiler and George Nunez
Defendant: Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP doing business as Johnson Controls
Case Number: 1:2021cv03800
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Conference adjourned to 8/6/21 at 3:00p.m. SO ORDERED. Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/22/2021) (mml)
June 22, 2021 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference with Plaintiffs' consent addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Defendant dated June 22, 2021. Document filed by Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP..(Rygiel-Boyd, Jennifer)
June 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Ann Rygiel-Boyd on behalf of Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP..(Rygiel-Boyd, Jennifer)
May 13, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP waiver sent on 5/10/2021, answer due 7/9/2021. Document filed by Gary Tetley; Brian E. McCrossin; George Nunez; Thomas R. Seiler; Thomas W. Seiler..(Menken, Bruce)
May 13, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b),. Document filed by Brian E. McCrossin, George Nunez, Thomas R. Seiler, Thomas W. Seiler, Gary Tetley..(Menken, Bruce)
May 10, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b),. Document filed by Brian E. McCrossin, George Nunez, Thomas R. Seiler, Thomas W. Seiler, Gary Tetley..(Menken, Bruce)
May 4, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b),. Document filed by Brian E. McCrossin, George Nunez, Thomas R. Seiler, Thomas W. Seiler, Gary Tetley..(Menken, Bruce)
May 4, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b),. Document filed by Brian E. McCrossin, George Nunez, Thomas R. Seiler, Thomas W. Seiler, Gary Tetley..(Menken, Bruce)
May 4, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT TO BECOME PARTY PLAINTIFF UNDER THE 29 U.S.C. 216(b),. Document filed by Brian E. McCrossin, George Nunez, Thomas R. Seiler, Thomas W. Seiler, Gary Tetley..(Menken, Bruce)
May 3, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP..(dnh)
April 30, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brian E. McCrossin, George Nunez, Thomas R. Seiler, Thomas W. Seiler, Gary Tetley..(Menken, Bruce)
April 30, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Menken, Bruce)
April 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Bruce Eric Menken. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Gary Tetley; Thomas R. Seiler; George Nunez; Brian E. McCrossin; Thomas W. Seiler. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
April 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Bruce Eric Menken to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF was not signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
April 30, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
April 30, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
April 30, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Bruce Eric Menken to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name on the PDF 'To' section must match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brian E. McCrossin, George Nunez, Thomas R. Seiler, Thomas W. Seiler, Gary Tetley..(Menken, Bruce) Modified on 4/30/2021 (jgo).
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Menken, Bruce) Modified on 4/30/2021 (jgo).
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24468952)Document filed by Gary Tetley, Brian E. McCrossin, George Nunez, Thomas R. Seiler, Thomas W. Seiler..(Menken, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tetley et al v. Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian E. McCrossin
Represented By: Bruce Eric Menken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W. Seiler
Represented By: Bruce Eric Menken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Tetley
Represented By: Bruce Eric Menken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R. Seiler
Represented By: Bruce Eric Menken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Nunez
Represented By: Bruce Eric Menken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP doing business as Johnson Controls
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Rygiel-Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?