Kriegman v. Mirrow et al
Plaintiff: Bruce P. Kriegman
Defendant: Alex Mirrow and Save It, LLC
Petitioner: Fatima Mirrow
Case Number: 1:2021cv03823
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 11 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re: #2 MOTION to Quash Deposition subpoena/subpoena duces tecum ., #3 MOTION to Quash . . Document filed by Bruce P. Kriegman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Charissa Hammer, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Charissa Hammer, #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Charissa Hammer, #4 Exhibit C to Affidavit of Charissa Hammer, #5 Exhibit D to Affidavit of Charissa Hammer, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9).(Rohde, Bruce)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #7 Motion for Bruce E. Rohde to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/28/2021) (ks)
May 27, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Bruce E. Rohde to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24594084. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Bruce E. Rohde to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24594084. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bruce P. Kriegman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bruce Rohde, #2 Certificate of Good Standing (CO), #3 Proposed Order re Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Rohde, Bruce)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION to Quash Deposition subpoena/subpoena duces tecum . . ENDORSEMENT. The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/20/2021) Responses due by 6/3/2021 (ks)
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION to Quash Deposition subpoena/subpoena duces tecum . . Document filed by Bruce P. Kriegman..(Rohde, Bruce)
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Bruce E. Rohde to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24561645. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bruce P. Kriegman..(Rohde, Bruce) Modified on 5/19/2021 (vba).
May 19, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #4 MOTION for Bruce E. Rohde to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24561645. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing Certificates of Good Standing; States Admitted Not Listed on Motion, Notarized Affidavit and/or Declaration;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (vba)
April 30, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Bryan John Brockington. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Bruce P. Kriegman, Alex Mirrow, Save It, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
April 30, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
April 30, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
April 30, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Quash . Document filed by Fatima Mirrow..(Brockington, Bryan)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Quash Deposition subpoena/subpoena duces tecum . Document filed by Fatima Mirrow..(Brockington, Bryan)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION MOTION TO QUASH. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24473374).Document filed by Alex Mirrow..(Brockington, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kriegman v. Mirrow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Mirrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Save It, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fatima Mirrow
Represented By: Bryan John Brockington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce P. Kriegman
Represented By: Bruce E Rohde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?