The Wonderful Company LLC et al v. Nut Cravings Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cal Pure Produce Inc. and The Wonderful Company LLC
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Nut Cravings Inc. and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 1:2021cv03960
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Michael M Vasseghi to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Michael M. Vasseghi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Michael M. Vasseghi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cal Pure Produce Inc., The Wonderful Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael M. Vasseghi, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Vasseghi, Michael)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zahreen Ghaznavi on behalf of Cal Pure Produce Inc., The Wonderful Company LLC..(Ghaznavi, Zahreen)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(sj)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Michael M. Vasseghi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24524060. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cal Pure Produce Inc., The Wonderful Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Vasseghi, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Vasseghi, Michael)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Jayaram, Vivek)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT TRADEMARK FORM. Notice to Attorney Vivek Jayaram to RE-FILE Document No. #8 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form is not correct; Date case was filed is incorrect. Re-file the document using the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 120 Patent/Trademark PDF form. (sj)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #10 MOTION for Michael M. Vasseghi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24524060. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California; Affidavit is not notarized.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - PDF ERROR AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Jayaram, Vivek) Modified on 5/11/2021 (sj).
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Nut Cravings Inc. waiver sent on 5/4/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. Document filed by The Wonderful Company LLC; Cal Pure Produce Inc...(Jayaram, Vivek)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 10, Nut Cravings Inc.. Document filed by The Wonderful Company LLC, Cal Pure Produce Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B).(Jayaram, Vivek)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Vivek Jayaram to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Vivek Jayaram. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Vivek Jayaram to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Vivek Jayaram. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The Wonderful Company LLC; Cal Pure Produce Inc.; Nut Cravings Inc.; John Does 1-10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cal Pure Produce Inc...(Jayaram, Vivek)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Stewart and Lynda Resnick Revocable Trust (1988), Corporate Parent Wonderful Legacy, Inc. for The Wonderful Company LLC. Document filed by Cal Pure Produce Inc., The Wonderful Company LLC..(Jayaram, Vivek)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vivek Jayaram on behalf of Cal Pure Produce Inc., The Wonderful Company LLC..(Jayaram, Vivek)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Jayaram, Vivek)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24492125)Document filed by The Wonderful Company LLC, Cal Pure Produce Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B).(Jayaram, Vivek) Modified on 5/5/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Wonderful Company LLC et al v. Nut Cravings Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nut Cravings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cal Pure Produce Inc.
Represented By: Vivek Jayaram
Represented By: Zahreen Ghaznavi
Represented By: Michael M. Vasseghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Wonderful Company LLC
Represented By: Vivek Jayaram
Represented By: Zahreen Ghaznavi
Represented By: Michael M. Vasseghi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?