Cadet v. Alliance Nursing Staffing of New York, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sherly Cadet
Defendant: Alliance Nursing Staffing of New York, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv03994
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Sherly Cadet P.O. Box 390 New York, NY 10040, at, on 6/9/2021 Re: #9 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, order granting IFP application, a copy of the Mediation Referral Order for Pro Se Employment Discrimination Cases, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (aan)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alliance Nursing Staffing of New York, Inc. (aan)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for permission for electronic case filing. (See Dkt. #5). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket entry 5. The Court also directs the Clerk of Court to: (i) issue a summons for Alliance, (ii) complete a USM-285 form with the service address for Alliance, and (iii) deliver all documents necessary to effect service of a summons and the complaint on Alliance to the U.S. Marshals Service. Motions terminated: #5 MOTION for Permission for Sherly Cadet to participate in electronic case filing in this case. filed by Sherly Cadet. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/9/2021) (rro) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR PRO SE EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION CASES: IT IS ORDERED that this pro se action is referred for mediation to the Courts Mediation Program. Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation. Unless otherwise ordered, the mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court, and all parties are obligated to continue to litigate this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall attempt to locate pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff at the mediation. Pro bono counsel will contact Plaintiff directly. The time to assign a mediator under Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Court's Mediation Program Procedures will be deferred until pro bono counsel has filed a Notice of Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel. Pro bono counsel will represent Plaintiff solely for purposes of the mediation, and that representation will terminate at the conclusion of the mediation process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any objection by Plaintiff either to the mediation or to the Court's request for pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff in the mediation must be filed within 14 days of this Order. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/9/2021) (rro)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 6/9/2021 Re: Judge Katherine Polk Failla #9 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Alliance Nursing Staffing of New York, Inc. (aan)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bcu)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/7/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION re: for Permission for Sherly Cadet to participate in electronic case filing in this case. Document filed by Sherly Cadet. (sac)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Sherly Cadet consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Sherly Cadet. (sac)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Sherly Cadet. (sac)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Alliance Nursing Staffing of New York, Inc. Document filed by Sherly Cadet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, B, C, D, E, F, G, & H, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (sac)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Sherly Cadet. (sac)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cadet v. Alliance Nursing Staffing of New York, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherly Cadet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Nursing Staffing of New York, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?