2109971 Ontario Inc. v. Samira Furniture Ltd et al
Plaintiff: 2109971 Ontario Inc. and 2109971 Ontario Inc. doing business as Xcella Furniture
Defendant: Nedal Ijbara, Velvet Import Corp., Wadha Igbara, Samira Furniture Ltd, Hollywood Furniture Ltd., Refat Ijbara and Samira Furniture Ltd doing business as Samira Outlet
Case Number: 1:2021cv04092
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 APPLICATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE REPLY TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT granting #26 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #26 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 1. Defendant's Motion hereby is GRANTED; and 2. The time within which Defendants Samira Furniture, Velvet Import, Wadha Igbara, Refat Ijbara, and Nedal Ijbara, shall answer, move or reply to the Amended Complaint extended to 7/16/2021. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/16/2021) (cf)
July 2, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Wadha Igbara answer due 7/16/2021; Nedal Ijbara answer due 7/16/2021; Refat Ijbara answer due 7/16/2021; Samira Furniture Ltd answer due 7/16/2021; Velvet Import Corp. answer due 7/16/2021. (cf)
July 1, 2021 Filing 26 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Document filed by Hollywood Furniture Ltd., Wadha Igbara, Nedal Ijbara, Refat Ijbara, Samira Furniture Ltd, Velvet Import Corp...(Chang, Joseph)
June 30, 2021 Filing 27 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #25 denying as moot #17 Motion to Dismiss. ENDORSEMENT: I am in receipt of Defendants' letter indicating that in light of Plaintiff's amended complaint, their motion to dismiss is now moot. Defendants' motion to dismiss, (Doc. 17), is deemed moot without prejudice to filing a new motion to dismiss based on Plaintiff's amended complaint. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate docket entry 17. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/30/2021) (rro) Modified on 7/1/2021 (rro).
June 29, 2021 Filing 25 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Joseph A. Chang dated 6/29/2021 re: Judge's Order entered 6/22/2021. Document filed by Hollywood Furniture Ltd., Wadha Igbara, Nedal Ijbara, Refat Ijbara, Samira Furniture Ltd, Velvet Import Corp...(Chang, Joseph)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re: #23 Amended Complaint, filed by 2109971 Ontario Inc.. Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that Defendants shall file a letter within seven (7) days deciding whether their motion to dismiss should be deemed moot without prejudice to refile a new motion to dismiss in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(3), or if I should evaluate Defendants current motion to dismiss in light of the facts alleged in the amended complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/21/2021) (kv)
June 17, 2021 Filing 23 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Hollywood Furniture Ltd., Wadha Igbara, Nedal Ijbara, Refat Ijbara, Samira Furniture Ltd, Velvet Import Corp. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by 2109971 Ontario Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C).(Brown, Michael)
June 17, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Nedal Ijbara served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/1/2021. Service was accepted by Nedal Ijbara, Defendant. Document filed by 2109971 Ontario Inc...(Brown, Michael)
June 17, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Hollywood Furniture Ltd. served on 5/29/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. Service was accepted by Melissa, General Agent. Document filed by 2109971 Ontario Inc...(Brown, Michael)
June 17, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Velvet Import Corp. served on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, Authorized Agent. Document filed by 2109971 Ontario Inc...(Brown, Michael)
June 9, 2021 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Samira Furniture Ltd served on 5/25/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. Service was accepted by Sanchari Rumot, Manager. Document filed by 2109971 Ontario Inc...(Brown, Michael)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER with respect to #17 Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file any amended complaint by June 28, 2021. It is unlikely that Plaintiff will have a further opportunity to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if no amended complaint is filed, Plaintiff shall serve any opposition to the motion to dismiss by July 7, 2021. Defendants' reply, if any, shall be served by July 21, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/9/2021) (kv)
June 9, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/28/2021. Responses due by 7/7/2021 Replies due by 7/21/2021. (kv)
June 7, 2021 Filing 17 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Document filed by Hollywood Furniture Ltd., Wadha Igbara, Nedal Ijbara, Refat Ijbara, Samira Furniture Ltd, Velvet Import Corp.. Responses due by 7/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law 12(b)(6), #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Chang, Joseph)
May 10, 2021 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (sj)
May 7, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Scott Weitzman on behalf of 2109971 Ontario Inc...(Weitzman, Kenneth)
May 7, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Straussman on behalf of 2109971 Ontario Inc...(Straussman, Richard)
May 7, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nedal Ijbara. (sj)
May 7, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wadha Igbara. (sj)
May 7, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Refat Ijbara. (sj)
May 7, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hollywood Furniture Ltd.. (sj)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Velvet Import Corp.. (sj)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samira Furniture Ltd. (sj)
May 7, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Brown. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: 2109971 Ontario Inc.; Samira Furniture Ltd. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)
May 7, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
May 7, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Brown. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1338. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 35:0271. (sj)
May 7, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 7, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
May 6, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nedal Ijbara, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 2109971 Ontario Inc...(Brown, Michael)
May 6, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Wadha Igbara, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 2109971 Ontario Inc...(Brown, Michael)
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Refat Ijbara, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 2109971 Ontario Inc...(Brown, Michael)
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hollywood Furniture Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 2109971 Ontario Inc...(Brown, Michael)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Velvet Import Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 2109971 Ontario Inc...(Brown, Michael)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brown, Michael)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samira Furniture Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 2109971 Ontario Inc...(Brown, Michael)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hollywood Furniture Ltd., Wadha Igbara, Nedal Ijbara, Refat Ijbara, Samira Furniture Ltd, Velvet Import Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24505733)Document filed by 2109971 Ontario Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D).(Brown, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 2109971 Ontario Inc. v. Samira Furniture Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2109971 Ontario Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2109971 Ontario Inc. doing business as Xcella Furniture
Represented By: Michael Brown
Represented By: Kenneth Scott Weitzman
Represented By: Richard Straussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nedal Ijbara
Represented By: Joseph Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velvet Import Corp.
Represented By: Joseph Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wadha Igbara
Represented By: Joseph Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samira Furniture Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollywood Furniture Ltd.
Represented By: Joseph Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Refat Ijbara
Represented By: Joseph Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samira Furniture Ltd doing business as Samira Outlet
Represented By: Joseph Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?