Maspeth Music BV v. Republic Records, a division of UMG Recordings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maspeth Music BV
Defendant: Republic Records, a division of UMG Recordings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04095
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 8/9/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties as follows: The time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended to July 16, 2021. SO ORDERED., Republic Records, a division of UMG Recordings, Inc. answer due 7/16/2021. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/4/2021) (rj)
June 4, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Maspeth Music BV..(Caplan, Brian)
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Republic Records, a division of UMG Recordings, Inc...(jgo)
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to REPUBLIC RECORDS, a division of UMG RECORDINGS, INC., re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Maspeth Music BV..(Van Benthysen, Brett)
May 10, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
May 10, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
May 10, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
May 10, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Brian D. Caplan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:294 Breach of Contract. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contact. (gp)
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Republic Records, a division of UMG Recordings, Inc.. Document filed by Maspeth Music BV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Caplan, Brian)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Van Benthysen on behalf of Maspeth Music BV..(Van Benthysen, Brett)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Maspeth Music BV..(Caplan, Brian)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Caplan, Brian)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT against Republic Records, a division of UMG Recordings, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24506416)Document filed by Maspeth Music BV..(Caplan, Brian) Modified on 5/7/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maspeth Music BV v. Republic Records, a division of UMG Recordings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maspeth Music BV
Represented By: Brian D. Caplan
Represented By: Brett Van Benthysen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Records, a division of UMG Recordings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?