Hess et al v. Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc.
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Padilla and Donald Hess
Defendant: Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04099
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 lr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Paul Pagano dated 6/30/21 re: Statement of Case, Motions, Settlement. Document filed by Donald Hess, Elizabeth Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Case Management and Scheduling Order).(Pagano, Paul)
June 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Savage Aibel on behalf of Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc...(Aibel, Matthew)
June 23, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Howard Ruzal on behalf of Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc...(Ruzal, Jeffrey)
June 18, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Steven J. Moser dated 6/18/2021 re: Basis for Diversity Jurisdiction. Document filed by Donald Hess, Elizabeth Padilla..(Moser, Steven)
June 16, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc. waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. Document filed by Donald Hess; Elizabeth Padilla..(Pagano, Paul)
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven John Moser on behalf of Donald Hess, Elizabeth Padilla..(Moser, Steven)
June 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Andrew Pagano on behalf of Donald Hess, Elizabeth Padilla..(Pagano, Paul)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, at 10:00 a.m., on July 7, 2021, to be held telephonically. The parties are directed to dial 888-398-2342 or 215-861-0674, and enter access code 5598827. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Initial Conference set for 7/7/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/25/2021) (kv)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/25/2021) (kv)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (as further set forth herein). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/25/2021) (kv)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc...(gp)
May 10, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp)
May 10, 2021 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp)
May 10, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (gp)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Donald Hess, Elizabeth Padilla..(Pagano, Paul)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pagano, Paul)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24507546)Document filed by Donald Hess, Elizabeth Padilla..(Pagano, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hess et al v. Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Padilla
Represented By: Paul Andrew Pagano
Represented By: Steven John Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Hess
Represented By: Paul Andrew Pagano
Represented By: Steven John Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bed Bath & Beyond, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Howard Ruzal
Represented By: Matthew Savage Aibel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?