Allen v. Patton et al
Plaintiff: Kent A. Allen
Defendant: Dara Khosrowshahi and Antwan Patton
Case Number: 1:2021cv04123
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), and as frivolous, 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. Plaintiff has consented to receive electronic service of notifications and documents in this action. (ECF 4.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/1/21) (rdz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2021: #1 PRO SE APPEAL PACKAGE) (rdz).
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Plaintiff's complaint, filed IFP under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1), is dismissed for failure to state a claim under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) (2)(b)(ii), and as frivolous, 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). Plaintiff has consented to receive electronic service of notices and documents in this action. (ECF 4.) The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/1/21) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Kent Allen consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Kent A. Allen.(sc)
May 21, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/19/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Dara Khosrowshahi, Antwan Patton. Document filed by Kent A. Allen..(rdz)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Kent A. Allen..(rdz)
May 7, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Patton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dara Khosrowshahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antwan Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent A. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?