Olin Holdings Limited v. State of Libya
Petitioner: Olin Holdings Limited
Respondent: State of Libya
Case Number: 1:2021cv04150
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of summons, petition and all attachments and supporting papers, and notice of suit, together with the Arabic translations of each of the aforementioned documents served on The State of Libya on 6/10/2021. Service was made by Head of the Ministry of Foreign Affairs of the State of Libya. Document filed by Olin Holdings Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FedEx Tracking Receipt).(Collins, Erin)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 9/27/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Petition, Summons, Notice of Petition, Amended Notice of Petition, Charlene C. Sun Affirmation, Exhibit A to Charlene C. Sun Affirmation, Exhibit B to Charlene C. Sun Affirmation, Exhibit C to Charlene CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Petition, Summons, Notice of Petition, Amended Notice of Petition, Charlene C. Sun Affirmation, Exhibit A to Charlene C. Sun Affirmation, Exhibit B to Charlene C. Sun Affirmation, Exhibit C to Charlene C. Sun Affirmation, Exhibit D to Charlene D. Sun Affirmation, Request for Judicial Intervention, Notice of Suit, Notice of Removal (State Court & S.D.N.Y) mailed to the Defendant THE STATE OF LIBYA, Attn: Ms. Najla Mangoush, Minister of Foreign AffaiC. Sun Affirmation, Exhibit D to Charlene D. Sun Affirmation, Request for Judicial Intervention, Notice of Suit, Notice of Removal (State Court & S.D.N.Y) mailed to the Defendant THE STATE OF LIBYA, Attn: Ms. Najla Mangoush, Minister of Foreign Affairs of Libya, Ministry of Foreign Affaris & International Cooperation, Ash Shatt Street, Tripoli, Libya V6W3+XQ on 06/02/2021 by Federal Express tracking # 811543668156, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Forrs of Libya, Ministry of Foreign Affaris & International Cooperation, Ash Shatt Street, Tripoli, Libya V6W3+XQ on 06/02/2021 by Federal Express tracking # 811543668156, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to the provisions of Foreign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (JKR) (Main Document 13 replaced on 6/2/2021) (JVR). eign Services Immunities Act, 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (JKR) (Main Document 13 replaced on 6/2/2021) (JVR).
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to State of Libya. (sj)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #10 Letter, filed by Olin Holdings Limited. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk should issue and sign a summons in this case so that it may be served on Libya with the Petition, Amended Petition and other documents file at the time other case was opened in State Court. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/26/2021) (ks) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing.
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from James E. Berger dated May 26, 2021 re: Requesting that the Court order the Clerk of Court to sign Petitioner's requested Summons. Document filed by Olin Holdings Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Berger, James)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JOINT STIPULATION: NOW THEREFORE, the parties, acting through counsel, hereby stipulate: 1. The parties consent to the vacatur of the State Court Order; 2. Olin undertakes to immediately serve the Petition and all supporting papers in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3); 3. Libya will file its response to the Petition within 60 days of the date of this Joint Stipulation; and 4. Olin will file its reply in support of the Petition within 21 days of service of Libya's response to the Petition. 5. By entering into this stipulation, Libya does not waive any rights, defenses or immunities and expressly reserves all such rights, defenses and immunities. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/21/2021) (ks)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney James Evan Berger to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons must be linked to a corresponding pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erin Collins on behalf of Olin Holdings Limited..(Collins, Erin)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charlene Chia-Ling Sun on behalf of Olin Holdings Limited..(Sun, Charlene)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to State of Libya, re: Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration. Document filed by Olin Holdings Limited..(Berger, James) Modified on 5/21/2021 (sj).
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Evan Berger on behalf of Olin Holdings Limited..(Berger, James)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Olin Holdings Limited..(Berger, James)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Arthur Meehan on behalf of State of Libya..(Meehan, Kevin)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joseph Pizzurro. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court);. (jgo)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pizzurro, Joseph)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 656980-2020. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24516651).Document filed by State of Libya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -1, #2 Exhibit -2, #3 Exhibit -3, #4 Exhibit -4, #5 Exhibit -5, #6 Exhibit -6, #7 Exhibit -7, Part 1, #8 Exhibit -7, Part 2, #9 Exhibit -7, Part 3, #10 Exhibit -7, Part 4, #11 Exhibit -7, Part 5).(Pizzurro, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olin Holdings Limited v. State of Libya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Libya
Represented By: Joseph Pizzurro
Represented By: Kevin Arthur Meehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Olin Holdings Limited
Represented By: James Evan Berger
Represented By: Charlene Chia-Ling Sun
Represented By: Erin Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?