Cepeda v. The State of New York et al
Plaintiff: Ramon Cepeda
Defendant: The State of New York, The Department of Correction and The City of New York
Case Number: 1:2021cv04205
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 PRO SE MEMORANDUM, dated 6/18/21 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Ramon Cepeda. New Address: #2412001136, G.R.V.C., 09-09 Hazen Street, E. Elmhurst, New York, 11370. (sc)
May 24, 2021 Mailed a copy of #4 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), Add and Terminate Parties, to Ramon Cepeda, NYSID: 01227680M, B&C: 2412001136 at Vernon C. Bain Center, 1 Halleck Street, Bronx, NY 10474. (dsh)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO AMEND: The Court dismisses Plaintiff's claims against the State of New York and the Department of Correction. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), (iii). The Clerk of Court is directed to add the City of New York as a Defendant under Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 21-CV-4205 (LTS). An Amended Civil Rights Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and he cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). The City of New York added. The Department of Correction and The State of New York terminated. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/21/2021) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
May 21, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/19/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
May 19, 2021 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Warden/Superintendent of Vernon C. Bain Center, 1 Halleck Street, Bronx, NY 10474. (dsh)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against The Department of Correction, The State of New York. Document filed by Ramon Cepeda. (sac)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER: The Court severs the claims of all plaintiffs under Fed. R. Civ. P. 21. (ECF 1 at 1-8.) Darrell Rose will proceed as the sole plaintiff in this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to open separate civil actions with new docket numbers for the following plaintiffs: Tyriek Gibson #3492000664; Jahiek Chunn #5412100066; Rydell Latta #5412100065; Dequawn McKenzie #2412100257; Christopher Queiroz #8252100137; George Hinton #8951900017; Sefton Jenkins #3492002568; Miguel Angel Acosta #3492100283; Luis Amaro #3492100291; Michael Aviles #2412001562; Denis Giovany Junes Rivas #1472100354; Ramon Cepeda #2412001136; Lawrence Richardson #3102100055; Daniel Young #4412001146; Jason Roldan #2412100201; Wilford Person #3102100054; Derrick Frances #2412100255; Hector Soto #5412100050; Joseph Yarbough #5412100095; Brian Miller #3492001719; Danny Delacruz #2412001135; Mitchell Thompson #3492001965; Shared King #4412001342; Chester Taylor #3601800108; Ernesto Valerio #21111903712; Michael Perry #132000229; Jamarr Credle #1412100476; Markus Useche #5411901662; Maurice Robinson #3492001360; Montrell Fortune #3002000273; Jordan Frederick #2411803708; Troy Campbell #3412001817; Deshaun Powell #8452100160; Rashaid Todman #2412100376; Daniel Hurdle #1412100581; Jeremy Cuevas #2412000701; Jared Eng #3491900860; Anand Seenarine #3491901188; Kevin R. Richardson #4412100274; Darron Swinnie #8952000358; and Calvin Devon Buchanan #2412100344. A copy of the complaint (ECF 2) and this order should be docketed in each new case. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to each of the plaintiffs at the following address: Vernon C. Bain Center, 1 Halleck Street, Bronx, New York, 10474, and note service on the docket. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/7/2021) (sac) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/12/2021) (sac).
May 7, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cepeda v. The State of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramon Cepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?