Dimapilis v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Louella Dimapilis
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC, COOPERSURGICAL, INC.,, The Cooper Companies, Inc., TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, INC. d/b/a TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC, Teva Women's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, LLC, Teva Women's Health, LLC and CooperSurgical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04243
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis J Liman
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of Georgia. (Signed by MDL Panel on 6/2/2021) (sjo)
June 2, 2021 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of Georgia. (sjo)
June 2, 2021 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of Georgia acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:21-cv-02259, filed on 06/02/2021. (sjo)
May 20, 2021 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teva Women's Health, LLC. (sj)
May 20, 2021 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CooperSurgical, Inc...(sj)
May 20, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc...(sj)
May 20, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Cooper Companies, Inc...(sj)
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (sj)
May 20, 2021 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Teva Women's Health, Inc.. (sj)
May 19, 2021 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teva Women's Health, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Louella Dimapilis..(Kassan, Randi)
May 19, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Coopersurgical, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Louella Dimapilis..(Kassan, Randi)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Louella Dimapilis..(Kassan, Randi)
May 19, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Cooper Companies, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Louella Dimapilis..(Kassan, Randi)
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Louella Dimapilis..(Kassan, Randi)
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Teva Women's Health, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Louella Dimapilis..(Kassan, Randi)
May 13, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
May 13, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Randi Alyson Kassan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Teva Women's Health, Inc., Teva Women's Health, LLC, Coopersurgical. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party type was entered incorrectly. (sj)
May 13, 2021 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
May 13, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 13, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Randi Alyson Kassan to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Each summons request must be its own separate docket entry or you may file one summons form with a rider/addendum attached listing all Defendants and addresses. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.; TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, INC. d/b/a TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC; TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC; TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.; THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.; and COOPERSURGICAL, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Louella Dimapilis. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., #2 Summons-The Cooper Companies, Inc., #3 Summons-Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #4 Summons-Teva Women's Health, Inc. d/b/a Teva Women's Health, LLC, #5 Summons-Teva Women's Health, LLC).(Kassan, Randi) Modified on 5/13/2021 (sj).
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kassan, Randi)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COOPERSURGICAL, INC.,, TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, INC. d/b/a TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC, TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Cooper Companies, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24527516)Document filed by Louella Dimapilis..(Kassan, Randi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dimapilis v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPERSURGICAL, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, INC. d/b/a TEVA WOMENS HEALTH, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CooperSurgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louella Dimapilis
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?