Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. Verizon Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC
Defendant: Verizon Communication, Inc. d/b/a Fios TV and Verizon Communications, Inc. doing business as Fios TV
Case Number: 1:2021cv04322
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Plaintiff Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC ("Plaintiff" or "RBDS") files this Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). According to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), an action may be dismissed by the plaintiff without order of court by filing a notice of dismissal at any time before service by the adverse party of an answer. Accordingly, Plaintiff hereby voluntarily dismisses this action against Defendant Verizon Communications, Inc. d/b/a Fios TV without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 4l(a)(1)(A)(i) with each party to bear its own fees and costs. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/8/2021) (rro)
July 8, 2021 Filing 18 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 7/8/2021 in a court action filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).(km)
July 8, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Verizon Communications, Inc.. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Johnson, Jay)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Geoffrey M. Godfrey dated June 30, 2021. Granted. There shall be no further adjournment. #1 Complaint., Verizon Communications, Inc. answer due 8/6/2021. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/30/2021) (vfr)
June 30, 2021 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Geoffrey M. Godfrey dated June 30, 2021. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc...(Godfrey, Geoffrey)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Geoffrey M. Godfrey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (jwh)
June 17, 2021 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Geoffrey M. Godfrey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24682863. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
June 16, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Geoffrey M. Godfrey to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24682863. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order).(Godfrey, Geoffrey)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Bruce R. Ewing dated June 4, 2021. Granted. Verizon Communications, Inc. answer due 7/7/2021. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/4/2021) (vfr)
June 4, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Bruce R. Ewing dated June 4, 2021. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc...(Ewing, Bruce)
May 20, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Verizon Communications, Inc. served on 5/17/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. Service was accepted by Robin Huttbanks, Intake Specialist. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
May 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The parties shall use the following dial- in credentials for the conference. Dial-in: Access code: 888-363-4749 4324948. Initial Conference set for 9/15/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/19/2021) (nb)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED STANDING ORDER IN RE IMPLEMENTATION OF PATENT PILOT PROGRAM IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 21, 2011). It appearing that the Court has elected to participate in the Pilot Project for Patent Cases established pursuant to Pub L. No. 111-349, 124 Stat. 3674. Therefore, effective November 21, 2011, the Court's participation in the Patent Pilot Project will commence and shall include pro se cases. The Pilot program will be subject to the following procedures: When a designated Pilot judge receives a patent case on initial assignment, the case shall be assigned to that judge for all purposes, without further notice to the Assignment Committee and the Case Assignment Unit.... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/29/2012) (wb)
May 19, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so redesignated. (wb)
May 19, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote, Patent Judge. Judge Philip M. Halpern is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
May 17, 2021 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (jgo)
May 14, 2021 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Verizon Communications, Inc...(jgo)
May 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jay B. Johnson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
May 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jay B. Johnson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Verizon Communication, Inc. d/b/a Fios TV. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was modified to add alias separately. (jgo)
May 14, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
May 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
May 14, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 13, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management, LLC for Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
May 13, 2021 Filing 4 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Johnson, Jay)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Verizon Communication, Inc. d/b/a Fios TV, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC..(Johnson, Jay)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Johnson, Jay)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Verizon Communication, Inc. d/b/a Fios TV. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24535181)Document filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Johnson, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. Verizon Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communication, Inc. d/b/a Fios TV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc. doing business as Fios TV
Represented By: Bruce Roy Millar Ewing
Represented By: Geoffrey M Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?