Sea Eagle Marine LTD. v. National Specialty Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: SEA EAGLE MARINE LTD and Sea Eagle Marine LTD.
Defendant: National Specialty Insurance Company and National Specialty Insurance Co.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04328
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 bc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER The parties are directed to file a Rule 26(f) report by July 23, 2021. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/9/2021) (ate)
July 8, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Sea Eagle Marine LTD.. Document filed by National Specialty Insurance Co...(Grasso, Joseph)
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation, acompany listed on the New York Stock Exchange and domiciled in the State of Virginia, Other Affiliate National Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State National Companies, Inc. for National Specialty Insurance Co.. Document filed by National Specialty Insurance Co...(Grasso, Joseph)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties through their undersigned counsel, that Defendant shall have through and including July 9, 2021, in which to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. APPROVED BY THE COURT. National Specialty Insurance Co. answer due 7/9/2021. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/11/2021) (mml)
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by National Specialty Insurance Co...(Grasso, Joseph)
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leah Mantei on behalf of National Specialty Insurance Co...(Mantei, Leah)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph G. Grasso on behalf of National Specialty Insurance Co...(Grasso, Joseph)
June 8, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 7/14/2021 at 12:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Specialty Insurance Co. (vf)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Specialty Insurance Co., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sea Eagle Marine LTD...(Butto, Gino)
May 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gino Joseph Butto. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract; Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract; the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S. (vf)
May 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gino Joseph Butto. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: SEA EAGLE MARINE LTD;National Specialty Insurance Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party name was entered incorrectly. (vf)
May 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 14, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
May 14, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Gino Joseph Butto to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): defendant party name error, the defendant name listed does not correspond to pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by SEA EAGLE MARINE LTD..(Butto, Gino) Modified on 5/14/2021 (vf).
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Butto, Gino)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Specialty Insurance Co. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24536091)Document filed by Sea Eagle Marine LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract of Insurance).(Butto, Gino) Modified on 5/14/2021 (vf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sea Eagle Marine LTD. v. National Specialty Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Specialty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Joseph G. Grasso
Represented By: Leah Mantei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEA EAGLE MARINE LTD
Represented By: Gino Joseph Butto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sea Eagle Marine LTD.
Represented By: Gino Joseph Butto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?