CG3 Media, LLC et al v. Belleau Technologies, LLC
Plaintiff: Corey Griffin and CG3 Media, LLC
Defendant: Belleau Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv04607
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mary Kay Vyskocil
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 dj
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court directs counsel for all parties to appear at an Initial Pretrial Conference on August 24, 2021, at 3:30 PM. The conference will be held telephonically. To join the conference, dial 888-278-0296 and enter access code 5195844. In advance of the Initial Pretrial Conference, and within 14 days of this Order, counsel must meet face-to-face for at least one hour to discuss the possibility of settlement as further set forth in this order., Initial Conference set for 8/24/2021 at 03:30 PM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 7/14/2021) (rj)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Belleau Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Lahav, Etai)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Belleau Technologies, LLC..(Lahav, Etai)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Etai Yaacov Lahav on behalf of Belleau Technologies, LLC..(Lahav, Etai)
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(jgo)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Keyhani, Dariush)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Belleau Technologies, LLC. (vf)
May 24, 2021 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (vf)
May 24, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 24, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Dariush Keyhani. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 35:271 Patent Infringement; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:2201; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
May 24, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
May 24, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Dariush Keyhani to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (vf)
May 24, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BELLEAU TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by CG3 Media, LLC, Corey Griffin..(Keyhani, Dariush)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Keyhani, Dariush)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Belleau Technologies, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24575320)Document filed by CG3 Media, LLC, Corey Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Keyhani, Dariush)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CG3 Media, LLC et al v. Belleau Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Griffin
Represented By: Dariush Keyhani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CG3 Media, LLC
Represented By: Dariush Keyhani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belleau Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Etai Yaacov Lahav
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?