JP Morgan Chase Severance Pay Plan v. Vicari
Plaintiff: JP MORGAN CHASE SEVERANCE PAY PLAN and JPMorgan Chase U.S. Severance Pay Plan Administrator
Defendant: ANTONINA VICARI
Case Number: 1:2021cv04641
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John P Cronan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying without prejudice #13 Letter Motion to Seal. This request is denied without prejudice. The Court respectfully directs Plaintiff to 4.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases for the correct procedure for requesting Court approval to file a document under seal.. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 7/8/2021) (nb)
June 28, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION to Seal - file two documents under seal addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Daniel M. Bernstein dated June 28, 2021. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase U.S. Severance Pay Plan Administrator. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1).(Bernstein, Daniel)
June 21, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Antonina Vicari waiver sent on 6/18/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase U.S. Severance Pay Plan Administrator..(Bernstein, Daniel)
June 4, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Antonina Vicari. (sj)
June 3, 2021 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Antonina Vicari, re: #9 Amended Complaint. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase U.S. Severance Pay Plan Administrator..(Bernstein, Daniel)
June 3, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Antonina Vicari.Document filed by JPMorgan Chase U.S. Severance Pay Plan Administrator. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Bernstein, Daniel)
June 3, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Daniel M. Bernstein to RE-FILE re: Document No. #7 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add party JPMorgan Chase U.S. Severance Pay Plan Administrator; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
June 3, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Daniel M. Bernstein to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request was not processed due to deficient pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
June 3, 2021 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners JPMorgan Chase U.S. Severance Pay Plan Administrator added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by JPMorgan Chase U.S. Severance Pay Plan Administrator. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Bernstein, Daniel)
June 2, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Antonina Vicari, re: #7 Amended Complaint. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Severance Pay Plan..(Bernstein, Daniel)
June 2, 2021 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Antonina Vicari.Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Severance Pay Plan. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Bernstein, Daniel) Modified on 6/3/2021 (jgo).
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: This case has been assigned to the undersigned for all purposes. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-john-p-cronan. Counsel for all parties are hereby ORDERED to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on August 9, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261, and as further set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 8/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 5/27/2021) (rjm)
May 26, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Antonina Vicari..(pc)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Antonina Vicari, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Severance Pay Plan..(Bernstein, Daniel)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ANTONINA VICARI, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by JP MORGAN CHASE SEVERANCE PAY PLAN..(Bernstein, Daniel) Modified on 5/25/2021 (vf).
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bernstein, Daniel)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Antonina Vicari . Document filed by JP Morgan Chase Severance Pay Plan . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Bernstein, Daniel)
May 25, 2021 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-24583303, paid on 5/25/2021. (vf)
May 25, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel M. Bernstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JP MORGAN CHASE SEVERANCE PAY PLAN, ANTONINA VICARI. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (vf)
May 25, 2021 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
May 25, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Daniel M. Bernstein to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the correct A.O. Summons in a civil case form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
May 25, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
May 25, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JP Morgan Chase Severance Pay Plan v. Vicari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONINA VICARI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JP MORGAN CHASE SEVERANCE PAY PLAN
Represented By: Daniel M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase U.S. Severance Pay Plan Administrator
Represented By: Daniel M. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?