Goldfarb v. Burt's Bees, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Goldfarb and Moshe Goldfarb
Defendant: Burt's Bees, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04904
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply / Letter Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Responsive Pleading addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Michael W. Ross dated July 30, 2021. Document filed by Burt's Bees, Inc...(Ross, Michael)
July 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael W. Ross on behalf of Burt's Bees, Inc...(Ross, Michael)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Request Granted. The defendant's response to the Complaint is hereby due no later than August 2, 2021. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/1/2021) (js)
July 1, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Burt's Bees, Inc. answer due 8/2/2021. (js)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Elizabeth A. Edmondson dated June 30, 2021. Document filed by Burt's Bees, Inc...(Edmondson, Elizabeth)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Burt's Bees, Inc. served on 6/11/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. Service was accepted by Lindsay Brunson. Document filed by Moshe Goldfarb..(Schlachet, Mark)
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Burt's Bees, Inc...(gp)
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Burt's Bees, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Moshe Goldfarb..(Schlachet, Mark)
June 9, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Mark Schlachet to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; PDF should consist of summons request only (Remove attached Complaint). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Burt's Bees, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Moshe Goldfarb. (Attachments: #1 Complaint).(Schlachet, Mark) Modified on 6/9/2021 (sj).
June 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mark Schlachet. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: David Goldfarb. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
June 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mark Schlachet. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Jury Demand code n (None);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff);. (jgo)
June 4, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 4, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schlachet, Mark)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Burt's Bees, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24624250)Document filed by David Goldfarb..(Schlachet, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldfarb v. Burt's Bees, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burt's Bees, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Austin Edmondson
Represented By: Michael W. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Goldfarb
Represented By: Mark Schlachet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moshe Goldfarb
Represented By: Mark Schlachet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?