McCoy v. The TJX Companies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Teresa McCoy
Defendant: The TJX Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv04907
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 pi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Management Plan is submitted by the parties in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3). All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Deposition due by 12/13/2021. All Fact Discovery due by 10/29/2021. All Expert Discovery due by 12/13/2021. This case is to be tried to a jury. The next Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/23/2021) (ama)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #15 Letter Notice of Initial Pre-trial Conference dated June 9, 2021 filed by The TJX Companies, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The initial pretrial conferences scheduled for July 30, 2021 is canceled. The parties' case management plan will be entered separately. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/23/21) (yv)
July 23, 2021 Filing 15 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Mary C. Azzaretto dated July 23, 2021 re: Notice of Initial Pre-trial Conference dated June 9, 2021. Document filed by The TJX Companies, Inc...(Azzaretto, Mary)
July 23, 2021 Filing 14 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by The TJX Companies, Inc...(Azzaretto, Mary)
July 21, 2021 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Teresa McCoy.(O'Neill, Michael)
July 21, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Gerard O'Neill on behalf of Teresa McCoy..(O'Neill, Michael)
June 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:In light of the COVID-19 situation, the Court will conduct the Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on July 30, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call 888-363-4749, Access code 3121171#, Security code 4907. (Initial Conference set for 7/30/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/9/2021) (rro)
June 7, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance served on Michael G. O'Neill on June 3, 2021. Service was made by mail. Document filed by The TJX Companies, Inc...(Azzaretto, Mary)
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 7.1 Disclosure served on Michael G. O'Neill on June 3, 2021. Service was made by mail. Document filed by The TJX Companies, Inc...(Leibowitz, Allison)
June 7, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal et al served on Michael G. O'Neill on June 3, 2021. Service was made by mail. Document filed by The TJX Companies, Inc...(Leibowitz, Allison)
June 7, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by The TJX Companies, Inc...(Leibowitz, Allison)
June 7, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so redesignated. (wb)
June 7, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Leibowitz, Allison)
June 4, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Allison Cory Leibowitz to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet. (vf)
June 4, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
June 4, 2021 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
June 4, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Leibowitz, Allison) Modified on 6/4/2021 (vf).
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Catherine Azzaretto on behalf of The TJX Companies, Inc...(Azzaretto, Mary)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allison Cory Leibowitz on behalf of The TJX Companies, Inc...(Leibowitz, Allison)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The TJX Companies, Inc...(Leibowitz, Allison)
June 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court - New York, County of New York. Case Number: 153619/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24624694).Document filed by The TJX Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Leibowitz, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. The TJX Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa McCoy
Represented By: Michael Gerard O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The TJX Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Cory Leibowitz
Represented By: Mary Catherine Azzaretto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?