Vences Estrada v. Touba General Discount, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Oscar Vences Estrada
Defendant: Touba General Discount, Inc. doing business as 99 Cents USA and Babacar Konte
Case Number: 1:2021cv05134
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Settlement discussions have not taken place. The parties have conferred pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 (f). This case is not to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 2-3 days. The initial telephone conference scheduled for September 2, 2021, is adjourned. The Court approves and so orders the parties' proposed scheduling order. The Court will also refer this matter to the the SDNY Mediation program The parties shall file a joint status letter on or before February 7, 2022. This Order may not be modified or the dates herein extended, except by further Order of this Court for good cause shown. Any application to modify or extend the dates herein (except as provided in paragraph 6(f) and 7(d)) shall be made in a written application in accordance with Courts Individual Practices and shall be made no less than two (2) business days prior to the expiration of the date sought to be extended. So Ordered. Deposition due by 12/1/2021. Fact Discovery due by 1/31/2022. Ready for Trial by 3/1/2022. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/31/2021) (js)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Mediators will be assigned based on the nature of suit. Additional expertise requests should promptly be directed to the Mediation Office. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 9/10/2021. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/31/2021) (vfr)
August 30, 2021 Filing 13 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Oscar Vences Estrada..(Cooper, Peter)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear telephonically for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on September 2, 2021, at 3:00 p.m. Counsel should call (888) 557- 8511 at the scheduled time. The access code is 9300838. Counsel who appear at the pretrial conference must be authorized to negotiate terms of settlement. Media and the public may join but are instructed to place their phones on mute. Counsel are directed to confer with each other prior to the conference regarding settlement and each of the other subjects to be considered at a Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 conference. Counsel are further directed to use the Courts Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order form (the "Form") to jointly prepare a detailed written proposed schedule for any motions and discovery. Counsel should type entries into this Form using a copy of the Form available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-j-paul-oetken. The parties shall submit a copy of the completed Form at least three business days prior to the date of the conference. So Ordered. Initial Conference set for 9/2/2021 at 03:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/9/2021) (js)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER:RECOMMENDED TEXT: THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 3 P.M. ON SEPTEMBER 2, 2021 IS RESCHEDULED FOR 3:30 P.M. ON THE SAME DAY. DIAL-IN INFORMATION REMAINS THE SAME. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken) (Text Only Order) (nd)
August 4, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Babacar Konte, Touba General Discount, Inc...(Hans, Stephen)
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Babacar Konte, Touba General Discount, Inc...(Hans, Stephen)
August 4, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen D. Hans on behalf of Babacar Konte, Touba General Discount, Inc...(Hans, Stephen)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Peter Hans Cooper on behalf of Oscar Vences Estrada. New Address: Cilenti & Cooper, PLLC, 200 Park Avenue - 17th Floor, New York, NY, 10166,..(Cooper, Peter)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Defendants were served on June 23 and 25, 2021. (Dkt. Nos. 56.) However, no appearance has been entered on Defendants behalf, and no response to the complaint has been filed in the allotted time. Plaintiff has not moved for a default judgment. Plaintiff is directed to notify the Court whether it intends to move for default judgment, or if it has received any communication from Defendants or their counsel regarding a response to the complaint. If Plaintiff fails by August 12, 2021 to either (1) file a letter concerning the status of the case, or (2) move for default judgment against Defendants, the action may be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order by mail on Defendants. So Ordered. (Motions due by 8/12/2021.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/28/2021) (js)
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Babacar Konte served on 6/25/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. Service was accepted by "John Smith". Document filed by Oscar Vences Estrada..(Cooper, Peter)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Touba General Discount, Inc. served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. Service was accepted by "John Smith". Document filed by Oscar Vences Estrada..(Cooper, Peter)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Babacar Konte, Touba General Discount, Inc.. (vf)
June 11, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf)
June 11, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf)
June 11, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (vf)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Touba General Discount, Inc. and Babacar Konte, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Oscar Vences Estrada..(Cooper, Peter)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Cooper, Peter)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Babacar Konte, Touba General Discount, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24655847)Document filed by Oscar Vences Estrada..(Cooper, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vences Estrada v. Touba General Discount, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Touba General Discount, Inc. doing business as 99 Cents USA
Represented By: Stephen D. Hans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Babacar Konte
Represented By: Stephen D. Hans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Vences Estrada
Represented By: Peter Hans Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?