Yang v. CIOPPA et al
Plaintiff: Yanying Yang
Defendant: District Director THOMAS CIOPPA, Alejandro Mayorkas, Acting Director TRACY RENAUD, Thomas Cioppa and Tracy Renaud
Case Number: 1:2021cv05151
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, Thomas Cioppa and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud, Thomas Cioppa. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Byars, Michael)
June 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of Thomas Cioppa, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud..(Byars, Michael)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus served. Thomas Cioppa served on 6/15/2021, answer due 8/16/2021; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 6/15/2021, answer due 8/16/2021; Tracy Renaud served on 6/15/2021, answer due 8/16/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Yanying Yang..(Li, Ling)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thomas Cioppa, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud. (sj)
June 14, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (rro)
June 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Emergency Rules in Light of COVID-19, which are available on the Court's website, for the dial-in number and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Emergency Rules (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/14/2021) (rro) Modified on 6/17/2021 (rro).
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thomas Cioppa, as Director, New York district; Tracy Renaud, as Director, USCIS; Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, DHS, re: #4 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Yanying Yang..(Li, Ling)
June 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ling Li to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request must be linked to the properly filed pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
June 14, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 14, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
June 14, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ling Li. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens;. (jgo)
June 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 FIRST COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Thomas Cioppa, Alejandro Mayorkas, Tracy Renaud.Document filed by Yanying Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Li, Ling)
June 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ling Li to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 6/16/2021. (jgo)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thomas Cioppa, as Director, New York district; Tracy Renaud, as Director, USCIS; Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, DHS, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yanying Yang..(Li, Ling) Modified on 6/14/2021 (jgo).
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Li, Ling)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - COMPLAINT against THOMAS CIOPPA, Alejandro Mayorkas, TRACY RENAUD. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24656863)Document filed by Yanying Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Li, Ling) Modified on 6/11/2021 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang v. CIOPPA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director THOMAS CIOPPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director TRACY RENAUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Cioppa
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Michael James Byars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yanying Yang
Represented By: Ling Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?