Denson v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Denson
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. and Zimmer, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv05159
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/14/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 22, 2021 Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/14/2021 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/23/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2021.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al..(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER NO. 61: Zimmer asks the Court to limit Plaintiff Nutting's affirmative deposition designations to 15 hours' worth of testimony, arguing that Plaintiffs current designations (which Zimmer estimates at 50 hours' worth) are over broad in light of the Court's order that each side will have five trial days (approximately 25-30 hours) for direct and cross examination. Defs.' Mot. Limit Pl.'s Dep. Designations 1 & n.1, 2, ECF No. 439.1 Plaintiff responds that these designations are all necessary, and that Zimmer's motion is premature-Plaintiff argues that the Court should not limit her designations until after the parties have winnowed them down through the objection and counter-designation process. Pl.'s Resp. to Defs.' Mot. Limit Pl.'s Dep. Designations 1-3, ECF No. 446. The Court will not limit the parties' designations at this time, but the parties are reminded that each side will have only five days in which to present its respective case-in-chief, and the Court will enforce those time limits. See In re Gen. Motors LLC Ignition Switch Litig., Nos. 14-MD-2543, 14-MC-2543, 2016 WL 4493863, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Aug. 24, 2016). Accordingly, Zimmer's motion is denied. (As further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/8/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al. (va)
June 14, 2021 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
June 14, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons in a Civil Action served on Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc. on 06/14/2021. Document filed by Thomas J. Denson. (Attachments: #1 Service confirmation email).(Faunce, Susan)
June 14, 2021 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer US, Inc.. (sj)
June 14, 2021 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer, Inc.. (sj)
June 14, 2021 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.. (sj)
June 14, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
June 14, 2021 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb)
June 14, 2021 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
June 11, 2021 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer US, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Thomas J. Denson..(Faunce, Susan) Modified on 6/14/2021 (sj).
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Thomas J. Denson..(Faunce, Susan) Modified on 6/14/2021 (sj).
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Thomas J. Denson..(Faunce, Susan) Modified on 6/14/2021 (sj).
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer US, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Thomas J. Denson..(Faunce, Susan)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Thomas J. Denson..(Faunce, Susan)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Thomas J. Denson..(Faunce, Susan)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Faunce, Susan)
June 11, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
June 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Susan A Faunce to RE-FILE Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020; the PDF must be filed separately;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
June 11, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Susan A Faunce. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand none;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,000,000;. (jgo)
June 11, 2021 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 18-md-2859. (jgo)
June 11, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Susan A Faunce to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): each summons request must be filed separately or one summons request may be filed with a rider/addendum attached;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. and Zimmer US, Inc.. f/k/a Zimmer Holdings, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Thomas J. Denson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons).(Faunce, Susan) Modified on 6/11/2021 (jgo).
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-MD-2859 (PAC). Document filed by Thomas J. Denson..(Faunce, Susan)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24657336)Document filed by Thomas J. Denson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet).(Faunce, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denson v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Denson
Represented By: Susan A Faunce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?