Paynes El-Bey v. ADT Security Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Queen Prinyah Godiah P. Paynes El-Bey
Defendant: Owner of 23 Lent St., Sheila L. Robinson-Zenon, 25 Lent Street, ADT Security Services, Inc., The Federal Savings Bank, 23 Lent Street, Tiffany Rodriguez, Pedro Cruz, Jac Builders LLC, Ariel Rodriguez, Owners/Tenants who resided at 23 Lent Street, Poughkeepsie, NY 12601, John/Jane Doe et al. and Francisco Cruz
Case Number: 1:2021cv05211
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 cv Fed. Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CIVIL JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the amended complaint is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/20/2022) (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Appeal Package) (sac)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: By order dated April 18, 2022, the Court directed Plaintiff to file a second amended complaint within 30 days. That order specified that failure to comply would result in dismissal of the amended complaint. Plaintiff has not filed a second amended complaint. Accordingly, the amended complaint, filed in forma pauperis (IFP) under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1), is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/20/2022) (sac)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO AMEND: The Court grants Plaintiff leave to file a second amended complaint to state facts in support of her FHA claim against Defendant Robinson- Zenon. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Courts Pro Se Intake Unit within 30 days of the date of this order, caption the document as a "Second Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 21-CV-5211 (LTS). A Second Amended Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and she cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the amended complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court dismisses all claims brought against ADT, FSB, Tiffany Rodriguez, Pedro Cruz, Jac Builders LLC, Ariel Rodriguez, Francisco Cruz, Owners/Tenants who resided at 23 Lent Street, Poughkeepsie, NY 12601," and "John/Jane Doe, et al." for failure to state a claim. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/18/22) (rdz)
November 30, 2021 Filing 14 LETTER from Queen 'Prinyah G. N. Payne's El-Bey, re: "SHEILA ROBINSON-ZENON SENT HER BOYFRIEND TO TRY TO KILL ME" - I want Sheila L. Robinson-Zenon to give me her boyfriend's last name, because I will be filing criminal charges for putting both my life and my health at risk. Since Sheila L. Robinson-Zenon enjoyed harassing me and caused me harm, now she is putting both my life and health at risk. The hospital/Mid-Hudson Regional Hospital diagnosed me with Acute Bronchospasm. Copies from the hospital discharge will be added with this etc. Document filed by Prinyah Godiah P. Paynes El-Bey.(sc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Queen 'Prinyah G. N. Payne's El-Bey, re: I have attached an update letter of what took place on 9/30/21. Since I am currently, patiently awaiting your next order. Document filed by Prinyah Godiah P. Paynes El-Bey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(sc)
August 26, 2021 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Queen 'Prinyah G. N. Payne's El-Bey, re: APOLOGY LETTER TO JUDGE SWAIN & GRATEFULNESS FOR HER ORDER. Document filed by Prinyah Godiah P. Paynes El-Bey.(sc)
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER(Response)TO JUDGE'S ORDER TO AMEND, re: #8 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening). Document filed by Prinyah Godiah P. Paynes El-Bey. (sc)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Queen 'Prinyah G. N. Payne's El-Bey, dated 8/7/21 re: CHALLENGE JUDGE: ORDER "ORDER TO AMEND"/ AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLAINT, "PEREMPTORY" & RECUSE JUDGE:HON. LAURA TAYLOR SWAIN. Document filed by Prinyah Godiah P. Paynes El-Bey.(sc)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO AMEND: Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 21-CV-5211 (LTS). An Amended Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and she cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court dismisses all claims brought against 25 Lent Street and 23 Lent Street for failure to state a claim. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) (2)(B)(ii). The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/28/21) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
June 25, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER from Queen 'Prinyah G. N. Payne's El-Bey, re: "LANDLORD RETALIATION EVICTION LETTER"- I had asked Sheila L. Robinson to do things legally by allowing the city to know what her plans were/are, and get the proper permits for safety concern since the house is an old house which was built in 1920 etc.. Document filed by Prinyah Godiah P. Paynes El-Bey.(sc)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Queen 'Prinyah G. N. Payne's El-Bey, re: "LANDLORD RETALIATION BY BLOCK ACCESS TO THE WIFI." Document filed by Prinyah Godiah P. Paynes El-Bey.(sc)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Queen 'Prinyah G. N. Payne's El-Bey, re: "23 LENT STREET TENANTS HARASSED ME AFTER THEY BLOCK ENTRANCED FOR ME TO GET INSIDE THE HOUSE." Document filed by Prinyah Godiah P. Paynes El-Bey.(sc)
June 22, 2021 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/21/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Queen Prinyah Godiah P. Paynes El-Bey consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Prinyah Godiah P. Paynes El-Bey. (sac)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against 25 Lent Street, ADT Security Services, Inc., Owner of 23 Lent St., Sheila L. Robinson-Zenon, The Federal Savings Bank. Document filed by Prinyah Godiah P. Paynes El-Bey. (sac)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Prinyah Godiah P. Paynes El-Bey. (sac)
June 10, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paynes El-Bey v. ADT Security Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owner of 23 Lent St.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila L. Robinson-Zenon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 25 Lent Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT Security Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Federal Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 23 Lent Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jac Builders LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ariel Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owners/Tenants who resided at 23 Lent Street, Poughkeepsie, NY 12601
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Queen Prinyah Godiah P. Paynes El-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?