Doe v. Decker et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Thomas Decker and Merrick Garland
Case Number: 1:2021cv05257
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Referring Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Alexandra Lampert dated August 5, 2021 re: Update Regarding Petitioners Appeal to the Board of Immigration Appeals. Document filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BIA Order (redacted)).(Lampert, Alexandra)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Alexandra Lampert dated August 5, 2021 re: Update Regarding Petitioners Appeal to the Board of Immigration Appeals. Document filed by Merrick Garland, John Doe, Thomas Decker, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BIA Order)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #9 .(Lampert, Alexandra)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #3 Complaint (redacted version). Document filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Accept BIA Brief (redacted)).(Lampert, Alexandra)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #3 Complaint . Document filed by John Doe, Thomas Decker, Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Accept BIA Brief, #2 Exhibit Updated Medical Records)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #9 .(Lampert, Alexandra)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #3 Complaint, #12 Response, . Document filed by Merrick Garland, Thomas Decker, Alejandro Mayorkas, John Doe. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #9 .(Friedman, Rebecca)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #3 Complaint, #12 Response, . Document filed by Thomas Decker, Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Friedman, Rebecca)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Naquan Bacchus in Opposition re: #3 Complaint, #12 Response,. Document filed by Merrick Garland, Thomas Decker, Alejandro Mayorkas, John Doe. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #9 .(Friedman, Rebecca)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECLARATION of Naquan Bacchus in Opposition re: #3 Complaint, #12 Response,. Document filed by Thomas Decker, Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Friedman, Rebecca)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** RESPONSE re: #3 Complaint Government Return. Document filed by Merrick Garland, Thomas Decker, Alejandro Mayorkas, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NTA and Notice of Custody Determination, #2 Exhibit Letter, #3 Exhibit Removal Order, #4 Exhibit BIA Notice, #5 Exhibit DHS Opposition, #6 Exhibit Letter)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #9 .(Friedman, Rebecca)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE re: #3 Complaint Government Return. Document filed by Thomas Decker, Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NTA and Notice of Custody Determination, #2 Exhibit Letter, #3 Exhibit Removal Order, #4 Exhibit BIA Notice, #5 Exhibit DHS Opposition, #6 Exhibit Letter).(Friedman, Rebecca)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Dana Ehrig in Opposition re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Merrick Garland, Thomas Decker, Alejandro Mayorkas, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Records)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #9 .(Friedman, Rebecca)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Nicole Kaye in Opposition re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Merrick Garland, Thomas Decker, Alejandro Mayorkas, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Records)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #9 .(Friedman, Rebecca)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Seal addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Rebecca R. Friedman dated July 8, 2021. Document filed by Thomas Decker, Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Friedman, Rebecca)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: granting #7 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The application is GRANTED. The government's opposition brief shall not exceed 30 pages. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/07/2021) (ama)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Rebecca R. Friedman dated July 6, 2021. Document filed by Thomas Decker, Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Friedman, Rebecca)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Ruth Friedman on behalf of Thomas Decker, Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Friedman, Rebecca)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #4 Letter filed by John Doe. ENDORSEMENT: The application is GRANTED. The above briefing schedule is adopted as an Order of the Court. Thomas Decker answer due 7/8/2021; Merrick Garland answer due 7/8/2021; Alejandro Mayorkas answer due 7/8/2021.( Replies due by 7/15/2021.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/22/2021) (cf)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Alexandra Lampert dated June 21, 2021 re: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule. Document filed by John Doe..(Lampert, Alexandra)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Paul G. Gardephe is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against Thomas Decker, Merrick Garland, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number 465401281045)Document filed by John Doe..(pc) Modified on 6/14/2021 (pc). (jgo).
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nmo)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(pc)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order SEALING ORDER DOCKETED IN 21MC463.(pc)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Decker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Decker
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Amelia Barriga Marritz
Represented By: Alexandra Lynn Lampert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?